Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2050742 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2050742



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 79
11.05.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.05.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.05.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
25.05.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
25.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.03.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.03.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.03.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.03.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.03.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
07.01.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.10.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.10.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.10.2009 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
23.07.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Description Search / examination 6
23.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.04.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.04.2009 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
25.03.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.03.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.03.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
24.03.2009 European search report Search / examination 3
30.01.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
30.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Description Search / examination 6
30.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
30.01.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5