EP2218476 - Leaf spring valve and cone membrane valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2022/11] |
Former [2016/34] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2010/33] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johner, Pascal Buchmattstrasse 40 3400, Burgdorf / CH | 02 /
Saint-Ghislain, Michel Au Corterain 161 1721, Cormérod / CH | 03 /
Fehr, Jean-Noel Mon-Riant 2 2000, Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/51] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
Johner, Pascal Buchmattstrasse 40 3400, Burgdorf / CH | ||
02 /
Saint-Ghislain, Michel Au Corterain 161 1721, Cormérod / CH | |||
03 /
Fehr, Jean-Noel Mon-Riant 2 2000, Neuchâtel / CH | Representative(s) | Pfaffmann, Lucas Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Str. 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2022/11] |
Former [2018/51] | Rentsch Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 203 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2012/15] | Rentsch Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2010/33] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09152621.0 | 11.02.2009 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218476 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218476 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2218476 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M39/24 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14264 (EP,US);
A61M2039/242 (EP,US);
A61M2039/244 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/33] | A61M39/28, F16K15/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/51] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blattfederventil und Konusmembranventil | [2010/33] | English: | Leaf spring valve and cone membrane valve | [2010/33] | French: | Soupape de ressort à lames et soupape de membrane de cône | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 07.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2019
11.11.2020
WITHDRAWN Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative Dirix, Yvo TecPharma Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2019
Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative Dirix, Yvo TecPharma Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | ||
Former [2019/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2019
Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | 26.09.2019 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 18.11.2019 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 17.12.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2021 | 08.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.06.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.01.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2009 | AT | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | DK | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | ES | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | HR | 19.12.2018 | IT | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MK | 19.12.2018 | NL | 19.12.2018 | PL | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | SE | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | MT | 11.02.2019 | BG | 19.03.2019 | NO | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 11.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 11.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 11.02.2019 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 19.12.2018 | |
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | |
NO | 19.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4789000 (ASLANIAN JERRY L [US]) [A] 1* figure 42 *; | [X]GB2280489 (VALEO WIPER SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 12-14 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6142979 (MCNALLY DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE19951669 (SIEPMANN TORSTEN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO02079679 (RECKITT BENCKISER UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 12-14 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO03043106 (STOCCHIERO FRANCO [IT]) [X] 12-14 * abstract *; | [X]EP1466646 (NUTRICIA HEALTHCARE S A [CH]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0035]; figures 2-4 *; | [X]US2004220542 (CISE DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO2005037349 (APPLICA GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US7291133 | Opposition | US2413303 | US4535820 | US4789000 | US4898581 | WO9516480 | WO9702059 | EP0882466 | WO02079679 | WO2008050126 |