Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2131591

EP2131591 - Image encoding method and apparatus thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.12.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue
Suite 200
Torrance CA 90503 / US
Former [2009/50]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kadono, Shinya
c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Develeopment Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / Hagai, Makoto
c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Develeopment Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2009/50]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date09152752.313.08.2002
[2009/50]
Priority number, dateJP2001026324831.08.2001         Original published format: JP 2001263248
[2009/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2131591
Date:09.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24, H03M7/40, H04N7/34, H03M13/07, H03M13/35
[2009/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2009/50]
TitleGerman:Bildverschlüsselungsverfahren und zugehörige Vorrichtung[2009/50]
English:Image encoding method and apparatus thereof[2009/50]
French:Procédé de codage d'image et son appareil[2009/50]
Examination procedure16.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/17]
19.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2014Date of oral proceedings
17.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.09.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination13.11.2014Appeal received No.  T2302/14
13.11.2014Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02755918.6  / EP1422944
Divisional application(s)EP14169510.6  / EP2804325
EP17168549.8  / EP3240196
EP18213010.4  / EP3490154
EP18213031.0  / EP3490155
EP18213066.6  / EP3490156
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020755918) is  09.05.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9922525  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [EY]US6493385  (SEKIGUCHI SHUNICHI [JP], et al) [EY] 1-10 * figures 2,4,5 *;
 [Y]EP0720379  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 3,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5168356  (ACAMPORA ALFONSE A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0501699  (RCA THOMSON LICENSING CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0469835  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 20 * * figures 5a,5b *;
 [A]US5402244  (KIM SANG-HO [KR]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 14 - line 62 * * figures 1,2A,2B,4 *;
 [A]US6020923  (HOSAKA KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - NOBUTAKA KUROKI ET AL, "LOSSLESS IMAGE COMPRESSION BY TWO-DIMENSIONAL LINEAR PREDICTION WITH VARIABLE COEFFICIENTS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, ENGINEERING SCIENCES SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (19920701), vol. E75 - A, no. 7, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 882 - 889, XP000311782 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - HE J ET AL, "On the application of turbo codes to the robust transmission of compressed images", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA 26-29 OCT. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971026), ISBN 0-8186-8183-7, pages 559 - 562, XP010253749 [Y] 3,9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1997.632182