Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2094000

EP2094000 - Imaging device of a camera [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silicon Micro Sensors GmbH
Königsbrücker Straße 96
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/35]For all designated states
Silicon Micro Sensors GmbH
Königsbrücker Strasse 96
01009 Dresden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Busse, Erik
Paditzer Fußweg 9
04600, Altenburg / DE
 [2009/35]
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Krenkelstraße 3
01309 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/35]Lippert, Stachow & Partner
Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3
01309 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date09153190.519.02.2009
[2009/35]
Priority number, dateDE2008101058722.02.2008         Original published format: DE102008010587
[2009/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2094000
Date:26.08.2009
Language:DE
[2009/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2094000
Date:05.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/225, H01L31/0232
[2009/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/35]
TitleGerman:Bilderfassungsvorrichtung einer Kamera[2009/35]
English:Imaging device of a camera[2009/35]
French:Dispositif de saisie d'images d'une caméra[2009/35]
Examination procedure05.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/03]
27.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0860/15
15.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2006132644  (SHANGGUAN DONGKAI [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4-6 [I] 4,5,7-10;
 [Y]US2005226608  (KWON SEONG-GEUN [KR], et al) [Y] 2,6 * abstract *;
 [XYI]US2006202106  (NISHIKAWA TAKUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6 [I] 3-5,7-10;
 [XYI]EP1223749  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2,6 [I] 3-5,7-10;
 [XYI]US2005179805  (AVRON JEROME [IL], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2,4-6 [I] 3,7-10;
 [Y]EP1008453  (FUTABA DENSHI KOGYO KK [JP]) [Y] 2,6 * abstract *
by applicantUS2006132644
 US2006202106
 EP1223749
 US2005179805
 US2005226608
 EP1008453