Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2094000

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure05.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Appeal following examination12.02.2015APPEAL FILED
15.04.2015APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
10.01.2020APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.08.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:26.08.2009 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA RS
 
Event date:05.06.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 5/225 20060101AFI20130426BHEP
 
Event date:05.06.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:05.06.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 31/0232 20060101ALI20130426BHEP
 
Event date:05.06.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA RS
 
Event date:15.01.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20131205
 
Event date:15.01.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:12.02.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20140127