Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2101191

EP2101191 - Method and apparatus for ultrasound synthetic imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.08.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SuperSonic Imagine
510, rue René Descartes
Les Jardins de la Duranne - Bât E et Bât F
13857 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR
[2018/10]
Former [2009/38]For all designated states
SuperSonic Imagine
Les Jardins de la Durance - Bât. E 510, Rue René Descartes
13857 Aix-en-Provence Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bercoff, Jeremy
Hotel du Poet 1 Place Forbin
13100 AIX EN PROVENCE / FR
02 / Cohen Bacrie, Claude
7 rue Henry Porte
13122 VENTABREN / FR
03 / Tanter, Mickael
7 rue de la Lisette
92220 BAGNEUX / FR
04 / Fink, Mathias
16 rue Edouard Laferrière
92190 MEUDON / FR
05 / Montaldo, Gabriel
26 rue de Navarin
75009 PARIS / FR
 [2009/38]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/38]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date09153358.820.02.2009
[2009/38]
Priority number, dateUS2008004764513.03.2008         Original published format: US 47645
[2009/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2101191
Date:16.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2101191
Date:06.07.2011
[2011/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/52, G10K11/34
[2009/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Ultraschallabbildungsverfahren und -vorrichtung[2009/38]
English:Method and apparatus for ultrasound synthetic imaging[2009/38]
French:Procédé et appareil pour imagerie synthétique à ultrasons[2009/38]
Examination procedure02.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/07]
17.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
13.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0614/15
13.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
19.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
03.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
18.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[I]US2004006272  (VORTMAN KOBI [IL], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0032] - [0038]; figure 1 *;
 [I]EP1777543  (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS [US]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0028] *
by applicantUS6689063
 US6551246
    - PRADA C; THOMAS JL, "Experimental subwavelength localization of scatterers by decomposition of the time reversal operator interpreted as a covariance matrix", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (200307), vol. 114, no. 1, pages 235 - 243
    - PRADA C; MANNEVILLE S; SPOLIANSKY D ET AL., "Decomposition nf the time reversal operator: Detection and selective focusing on two scatterers", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (199604), vol. 99, no. 4, pages 2067 - 2076