Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2160037

EP2160037 - Methods and systems for converting 2D motion pictures for stereoscopic 3D exhibition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.08.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
28.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMAX CORPORATION
2525 Speakman Drive Sheridan Park
Mississauga, Ontario L5K 1B1 / CA
[2010/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Zhou, Samuel
5888 Shelford Terrace
Mississauga Ontario L6M 6J9 / CA
02 / Judkins, Paul
27 Halton Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1R5 / CA
03 / Ye, Ping
3382 Ash Row
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1K4 / CA
 [2010/09]
Representative(s)Phillips & Leigh LLP
Temple Chambers
3-7 Temple Avenue
London EC4Y 0DA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/09]Weston, Robert Dale , et al
Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Application number, filing date09153591.425.06.2007
[2010/09]
Priority number, dateUS2006081627223.06.2006         Original published format: US 816272
[2010/09]
Previously filed application, dateEP2007078943925.06.2007
[2010/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2160037
Date:03.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2160037
Date:17.11.2010
[2010/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/00
[2010/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/09]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Systeme zur Umwandlung von 2D-Filmen für stereoskopische 3D-Vorführung[2010/09]
English:Methods and systems for converting 2D motion pictures for stereoscopic 3D exhibition[2010/09]
French:Procédés et systèmes de conversion d'images cinématographiques 2D pour une représentation stéréoscopique 3D[2010/09]
Examination procedure17.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/25]
10.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
24.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.03.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination23.05.2014Appeal received No.  T1656/14
24.07.2014Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07789439.2  / EP2033164
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070789439) is  30.03.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[I]EP0742674  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [I] 1-8 * page 9, line 42 - line 48; figure 5 * * page 10, line 49 - page 11, line 8 * * page 11, line 37 - line 40 *;
 [I]EP0735512  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [I] 1-8 * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 6 *
by applicantEP0742674