Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2160037


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.09.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
28.09.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2018 Change - representative
22.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.08.2014 Change: Appeal number
26.07.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
27.05.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
27.05.2014 New entry: Appeal number
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.03.2014 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
16.08.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.06.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.06.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.02.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.02.2012 First examination report
17.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2011 Definitive list of designations published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
20.05.2011 Request for examination filed published on  22.06.2011  [2011/25]
19.05.2011 Amendment by applicant
15.10.2010 Publication of search report published on  17.11.2010  [2010/46]
16.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.01.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.03.2010  [2010/09]
04.03.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
04.03.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid