Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2224383

EP2224383 - Method for scheduling a production process by supporting the visualization of material shortages [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2018New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
[2017/35]
Former [2013/11]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2010/35]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fontanot, Paolo
Via Verdi, 15
34074 Monfalcone / IT
 [2010/35]
Representative(s)Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[2014/33]
Former [2010/35]Fischer, Michael
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date09153610.225.02.2009
[2010/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2224383
Date:01.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00
[2010/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Planen eines Herstellungsverfahren durch Unterstützung der Ansicht von Materialengpässen[2010/35]
English:Method for scheduling a production process by supporting the visualization of material shortages[2010/35]
French:Procédé de programmation d'un procédé de production en prenant en charge la visualisation de pénuries de matériel[2010/35]
Examination procedure20.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/04]
15.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.12.2018
05.12.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
19.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
19.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
20.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
19.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]US6801820  (LILLY RICHARD T [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 22 * * column 5, line 44 - column 7, line 35 * * column 8, line 1 - column 9, line 16 *;
 [I]US2008294279  (TIOZZO FABIO [IT]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004119713  (MEYRINGER MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, paragraphs 1-10 * * page 2, paragraphs 17-24 *