blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2105583

EP2105583 - Turbocharger comprising a sliding piston and vanes with leakage dams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/40]Turbocharger with sliding piston, and having vanes and leakage dams
[2016/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2009/40]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07962 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Roberts, Quentin
16 avenue Analole France Nancy
54000, Meuthe et Moselle / FR
02 / Alnega, Ahmed
Z. I. Inova 3000
88156, Thaon Les Vosges / FR
 [2017/16]
Former [2009/40]01 / Roberts, Quentin
16 avenue Analole France Nancy
54000, Meuthe et Moselle / FR
02 / Alnega, Ahmed
Z. I. Inova 3000
88156, Thaon Les Vosges / FR
Representative(s)Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[2017/16]
Former [2009/40]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date09154579.807.03.2009
[2009/40]
Priority number, dateUS2008005805228.03.2008         Original published format: US 58052
[2009/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2105583
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2105583
Date:14.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2105583
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2014
ClassificationIPC:F01D17/14, F01D17/16, F02C6/12, F01D11/00
[2014/20]
CPC:
F01D17/143 (EP,US); F01D11/005 (EP,US); F01D17/167 (EP,US);
F02C6/12 (EP,US); F05D2220/40 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2009/40]F01D17/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2015/04]
Former [2009/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Turbolader mit Gleitkolben und Leitschaufeln mit Dichtungsdämmen[2016/51]
English:Turbocharger comprising a sliding piston and vanes with leakage dams[2016/47]
French:Turbocompresseur à piston coulissant et des aubes directrices avec des barrières anti-fuite[2016/47]
Former [2009/40]Turbolader mit Gleitkolben und Schaufeln und Auslaufsperren
Former [2009/40]Turbocharger with sliding piston, and having vanes and leakage dams
Former [2009/40]Turbocompresseur à piston coulissant et ayant des aubes et des barrières anti-fuite
Examination procedure07.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/40]
16.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2014Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.01.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
08.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2017Fee for grant paid
09.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.12.2016
Opposition(s)22.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2007058649  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 10-14 * paragraphs [0048] - [0049] * * figures 17-18 *;
 [A]US5214920  (LEAVESLEY MALCOLM G [GB]) [A] 10-14 * columns 5-8 * * figures 1,13-15 *;
 [A]EP1790829  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 10-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005059317  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 10-14 * pages 1-8 * * figures 1-6 *
by applicantWO2004074642
 US6694733
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.