blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2230331

EP2230331 - Galvanic method for depositing a charcoal grey coating and metal parts with such a coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universo S.A.
Rue des Crêtets 11 Case Postale 1549
2301 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH
[2010/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Henzirohs, Christophe
Pierre-Pertuis 9
2605, Sonceboz / CH
 [2011/43]
Former [2010/38]01 / Henzirohs, Christophe
Pierre-Pertuis 9
2605, Sonceboz / CH
Representative(s)Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/38]Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al
ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date09155762.920.03.2009
[2010/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2230331
Date:22.09.2010
Language:FR
[2010/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2230331
Date:26.10.2011
Language:FR
[2011/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2009
ClassificationIPC:C25D3/62, C25D5/48, C25D5/52
[2010/38]
CPC:
C25D3/62 (EP,US); C25D5/48 (EP,US); C25D5/52 (EP,US);
Y10S428/935 (EP,US); Y10T428/12493 (EP,US); Y10T428/12889 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/38]
TitleGerman:Galvanisches Beschichtungsverfahren zur Aufbringung einer anthrazitfarbenen Beschichtung und mit dieser Beschichtung versehene Metallteile[2010/38]
English:Galvanic method for depositing a charcoal grey coating and metal parts with such a coating[2010/38]
French:Procédé galvanique de dépôt d'un revêtement de couleur anthracite et pièces métalliques munies d'un tel revêtement[2010/38]
Examination procedure22.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
29.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2011Fee for grant paid
08.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2011
Opposition(s)27.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.03.2009
AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MK26.10.2011
MT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
TR26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
LU20.03.2012
BE31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MK26.10.2011
MT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
TR26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
LU20.03.2012
BE31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2014/21]AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MK26.10.2011
MT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
TR26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
BE31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2013/35]AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MK26.10.2011
MT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
BE31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2013/29]AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MK26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
BE31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2013/22]AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MK26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
BE31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2013/12]AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MK26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
BE31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2013/07]AT26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
BE31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2012/47]CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2012/37]CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/36]CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/35]CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
IE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/34]CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/28]CY26.10.2011
HR26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/27]HR26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/26]LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/24]LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/23]LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
NO26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/21]LT26.10.2011
NO26.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT26.10.2011
NO26.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US3502548  (LYONS ERNEST H JR) [A] 1-7 * column 11, lines 14-26 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 24 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 44 * * examples 13-16 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [Y]EP0686706  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6,7,6,7,6,7,6,7 * abstract * * page 3, lines 23-53 * * page 4, lines 39-51 * * page 5, lines 19-34 * * page 8, line 57 - page 9, line 4 * * examples 1,3 *;
 [A]US2008261025  (ABYS JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0052] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.