Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2113189

EP2113189 - System of accessories for use with bronchoscopes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU, LU
published on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2013/36]
Former [2013/35]For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US
Former [2009/45]For all designated states
Super Dimension Ltd.
P.O. Box 2045
Herzeliya 46120 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / Greenburg, Benny
16 Lotem St.
45100, Hod Hasharon / IL
02 / Belcher, Danny
10 Yehuda St.
52504, Ramat Gan / IL
03 / Griefner, Gil
12 Itamar St.
52531, Ramat Gan / IL
04 / Becker, Heinrich
c/o Super Dimension Ltd.
P.O. Box 2045
46120, Herzeliya / IL
 [2013/36]
Former [2009/45]01 / Greenburg, Benny
16 Lotem St.
45100, Hod Hasharon / IL
02 / Belcher, Danny
10 Yehuda St.
52504, Ramat Gan / IL
03 / Griefner, Gil
12 Itamar St.
52531, Ramat Gan / IL
04 / Becker, Heinrich
c/o Super Dimension Ltd. P.O. Box 2045
46120, Herzeliya / IL
Representative(s)Sach, Greg Robert
Hoffmann · Eitle
Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
[2014/13]
Former [2014/04]Sach, Greg Robert
Hoffmann · Eitle
Arabellastraße 4
DE-81925 München / DE
Former [2013/36]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date09157586.014.09.2004
[2009/45]
Priority number, dateUS20030502615P15.09.2003         Original published format: US 502615 P
US20040550346P08.03.2004         Original published format: US 550346 P
US20040564944P26.04.2004         Original published format: US 564944 P
[2009/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2113189
Date:04.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2113189
Date:30.12.2009
[2009/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2113189
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/267
[2009/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/45]
TitleGerman:System aus Zubehör zur Verwendung mit Bronchoskopen[2009/45]
English:System of accessories for use with bronchoscopes[2009/45]
French:Système d'accessoires pour utilisation avec des bronchoscopes[2009/45]
Examination procedure07.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/21]
15.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2013Fee for grant paid
24.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04770514.0  / EP1667749
Divisional application(s)EP10191689.8  / EP2316328
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040770514) is  20.02.2009
Opposition(s)05.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.09.2004
AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
TR04.09.2013
IE14.09.2013
LU14.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
TR04.09.2013
IE14.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
IE14.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/34]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
IE14.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/33]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
IE14.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/29]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/23]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT04.09.2013
BE04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY07.08.2013
AT04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY07.08.2013
AT04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY07.08.2013
AT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003040657  (YAMAYA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 66 *;
 [A]US2002162555  (WEST SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * figure 19 *;
 [A]US5230622  (BROSSOIT A DOUGLAS [US]) [A] * abstract *
by applicantWO03086498