Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2133017

EP2133017 - Filter bag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wolf PVG GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft
Industriestrasse 15
32602 Vlotho-Exter / DE
[2009/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Rosemeier, Brigitte
Sonnenhang 6
32602 Vlotho / DE
02 / Czado, Wolfgang
Ziegeleiweg 41
32429 Minden / DE
 [2014/02]
Former [2009/51]01 / Rosemeier, Brigitte
Sonnenhang 6
32602 Vlotho / DE
02 / Czado, Wolfgang
Ziegeleiweg 41
32429 Minden / DE
Representative(s)Dantz, Jan Henning , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2014/02]
Former [2009/51]Dantz, Jan Henning , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date09160485.018.05.2009
[2009/51]
Priority number, dateDE20082007717U10.06.2008         Original published format: DE 202008007717 U
[2009/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2133017
Date:16.12.2009
Language:DE
[2009/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2133017
Date:08.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:A47L9/14
[2009/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/51]
TitleGerman:Filterbeutel[2009/51]
English:Filter bag[2009/51]
French:Sac filtrant[2009/51]
Examination procedure09.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/16]
06.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2013Fee for grant paid
22.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014  05.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Eurofilters Holding N.V.
Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014  05.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Eurofilters Holding N.V.
Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2014/41]
Opponent(s)01  02.09.2014   
Eurofilters Holding N.V.
Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
Opponent's representative
Weigelt, Udo
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
12.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition03.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0318/17
07.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.05.2009
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
IT08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MK08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT18.05.2014
GB18.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
BE31.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU18.05.2009
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
IT08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT18.05.2014
GB18.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
BE31.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/32]HU18.05.2009
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
IT08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT18.05.2014
GB18.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
BE31.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/29]BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
IT08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT18.05.2014
GB18.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/28]BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT18.05.2014
GB18.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/16]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT18.05.2014
GB18.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/38]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
AT18.05.2014
GB18.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/24]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
GB18.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE18.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU18.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/39]CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY08.01.2014
ES08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]DE202008003248U  (EUROFILTERS HOLDING NV [BE]) [X] 1,3-5,8-16 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] , [0024] - [0041] - [0045] - [0050]; figure - *;
 [DX]DE202005009452U  (MELITTA HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE [DE]) [DX] 1,5,8-16 * paragraphs [0014] - [0023]; figure 2 *
by applicantDE202006016303U
 DE202008003248U