Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2263664

EP2263664 - Opioid receptors stimulating compounds (thymoquinone, Nigella sativa) and food allergy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.10.2014
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2014Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.11.2014  [2014/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2010/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Nutten, Sophie
Ch. de l'Avant poste, 3
1005, LAUSANNE / CH
02 / Philippe, David
Avenue Sainte Luce 11
1003, LAUSANNE / CH
03 / Mercenier, Annick
72, Le Grands Chemin
1066, Epalinges / CH
04 / Duncker, Swantje
Av. de Béthusie 84
1012, LAUSANNE / CH
 [2010/51]
Representative(s)Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie , et al
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie , et al
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2013/21]Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie , et al
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2010/51]Marquardt, Ulf
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date09160492.618.05.2009
[2010/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2263664
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/122, A61K36/28, A61K36/53, A61K36/71, A61P37/00
[2010/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/51]
TitleGerman:Opioid-Rezeptoren stimulierender Wirkstoff (Thymoquinon, Nigella sativa) und Lebensmittelallergie[2010/51]
English:Opioid receptors stimulating compounds (thymoquinone, Nigella sativa) and food allergy[2010/51]
French:Composé (thymoquinone, Nigella sativa) stimulant les récepteurs opioïdes et allergie alimentaire[2010/51]
Examination procedure18.02.2011Observations by third parties
22.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/31]
23.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/45]
30.06.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0051580  (AL JASSIM RAWAA [AU]; AL KAISI BAN [US]; JAMES DAVID [QA]; NASSIEF NID) [X] 1-15 * claims 5-7 * * page 7, lines 15-17 * * page 8, lines 10-11. *;
 [X]US5989560  (TERRY TRAVIS L [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * claim 22 * * column 1, line 34 - line 35 *;
 [Y]  - MUTABAGANI A ET AL, "A STUDY OF THE ANTI-INFLAMMATORY ACTIVITY OF NIGELLA SATIVE L. AND THYMOQUINONE IN RATS", SAUDI PHARMACEUTICAL JOURNAL, SAUDI PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY, RIYAD, SA, (19970101), vol. 5, no. 2/03, ISSN 1319-0164, pages 110 - 113, XP000964634 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - GALI-MUHTASIB H ET AL, "Thymoquinone: A promising anti-cancer drug from natural sources", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, EXETER, GB, vol. 38, no. 8, ISSN 1357-2725, (20060101), pages 1249 - 1253, (20060101), XP024987522 [Y] 1-15 * page 1251, column R, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biocel.2005.10.009
 [Y]  - WATANABE J ET AL, "Coumarin and flavone derivatives from estragon and thyme as inhibitors of chemical mediator release from RBL-2H3 cells", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY JANUARY 2005 JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY AND AGROCHEMISTRY JP, (200501), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 1 - 6, XP002458174 [Y] 1-15 * figure 2; table 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.69.1
by applicant   - RONA,R.J. ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 120, pages 638 - 646
    - JOHANSSON,S.G. ET AL., "A revised nomenclature for allergy. An EAACI position statement from the EAACI nomenclature task force", ALLERGY, (2001), vol. 56, pages 813 - 824
    - TRANG ET AL., PLANTA MED, (1993), vol. 59, page 99
    - HOSSEINZADEH ET AL., PHYTOMEDICINE, (2004), vol. 11, pages 56 - 64
    - YI ET AL., MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, (2008), vol. 7, pages 1789 - 1796
    - BRANDT, E.B. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST, (2003), vol. 112, pages 1666 - 1677
other   - "Safoof Baraae Jarb Wa Hikkah", TKDL, Database accession no. Ah3/612C, XP003024383
    - ALI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSA, Kaamil-al-Sena'ah, (2005), page 110
    - "Valluluvai Thylam", TKDL, Database accession no. GP13/70, XP003024384
    - I.N.A., Chimittu Rathna churukkam, pages 71 - 72
    - "Veliparuthi Nei", TKDL, Database accession no. Am04/367, XP003024385
    - AGASTHIYAR, Balavakadam, (1933), pages 337 - 329
    - "Malli Choornam", TKDL, Database accession no. SK03/84, XP003024386
    - KANNUSAMY PILLAI, Chikithsa Rathna Deepam, (1956), page 116
    - "Majoon Fanjnosh Bara-e-Amraaz-e-meda", TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/3189, XP003024387
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1909), page 645
    - "Jirakatritayama Gunah", TKDL, Database accession no. RS6/1214, XP003024388
    - KAIYADEVA, Kaiyadevanighantau, (1979), page 219
    - "Suksmailadi Curna", TKDL, Database accession no. RG9/12, XP003024389
    - SODHALA, Sodhalanighantauh, (1978), page 3