Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2163972

EP2163972 - Mobile terminal with touch input and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/11]Mobile terminal and control method thereof
[2010/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2010/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Oh, Jung-A
Risencheu Apt. 259-3302
Jamsil-Dong, Songpa-Gu
SEOUL / KR
02 / Kim, Tae-Hoon
Geomdan 1st Poongrim Apt. 302-801
Wanggil-Dong
INCHEON / KR
 [2018/02]
Former [2010/11]01 / Oh, Jung-A
Risencheu Apt. 259-3302 Jamsil-Dong, Songpa-Gu
SEOUL / KR
02 / Kim, Tae-Hoon
Geomdan 1st Poongrim Apt. 302-801 Wanggil-Dong
INCHEON / KR
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/02]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2010/11]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date09161869.403.06.2009
[2010/11]
Priority number, dateKR2008008695603.09.2008         Original published format: KR 20080086956
[2010/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2163972
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2163972
Date:19.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2163972
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2017/37]
Former International [2010/11]G06F3/048, G06F3/041
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/02]
Former [2010/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mobiles Endgerät mit Berührungseingabe und Steuerverfahren hierfür[2010/42]
English:Mobile terminal with touch input and control method thereof[2010/42]
French:Terminal mobile avec entrée tactile et son procédé de commande[2010/42]
Former [2010/11]Mobiles Endgerät und Steuerungsverfahren dafür
Former [2010/11]Mobile terminal and control method thereof
Former [2010/11]Terminal mobile et son procédé de contrôle
Examination procedure03.06.2009Examination requested  [2010/11]
07.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2017Fee for grant paid
30.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.01.2017
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
GB03.06.2018
IE03.06.2018
LU03.06.2018
MT03.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/24]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
GB03.06.2018
IE03.06.2018
LU03.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/21]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
GB03.06.2018
IE03.06.2018
LU03.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/19]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
IE03.06.2018
LU03.06.2018
Former [2019/17]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
LU03.06.2018
Former [2019/15]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]US2003234768  (REKIMOTO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0031] - [0068]; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US2007291015  (MORI EIJIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0052]; figures 2-8 *