blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2138859

EP2138859 - Temperature System with Magnetic Field Suppression [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 03.08.2022  [2022/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc.
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/25]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc.
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US
Former [2019/21]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Guidance And Electronic Company, Inc.
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc.
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bulatowicz, Michael D.
9001 Owensmouth Avenue
Unit 26
Canoga Park, CA 91304 / US
 [2019/21]
Former [2010/01]01 / Bulatowicz, Michael D.
9001 Owensmouth Avenue Unit 26
Canoga Park, CA 91304 / US
Representative(s)Martin, Philip John
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
[2019/21]
Former [2010/01]Martin, Philip John
Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
Application number, filing date09162674.715.06.2009
[2010/01]
Priority number, dateUS2008014422523.06.2008         Original published format: US 144225
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2138859
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2138859
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/21]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2138859
Date:26.06.2019
[2019/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2009
ClassificationIPC:G01R33/31, H05B3/16, H05B3/18, H05B3/20
[2010/01]
CPC:
G01R33/31 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/21]
Former [2010/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Temperatursystem mit Magnetfeldunterdrückung[2010/01]
English:Temperature System with Magnetic Field Suppression[2010/01]
French:Système de température doté d'une suppression du champ magnétique[2010/01]
Examination procedure15.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/53]
16.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2019Fee for grant paid
10.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.05.2019Request for correction of the decision to grant filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2013
Opposition(s)25.02.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.06.2009
AT22.05.2019
CY22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
MK22.05.2019
MT22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
PL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SI22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
TR22.05.2019
IE15.06.2019
LU15.06.2019
BE30.06.2019
CH30.06.2019
LI30.06.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
IS22.09.2019
PT22.09.2019
[2022/31]
Former [2021/34]HU15.06.2009
AT22.05.2019
CY22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
MT22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
PL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SI22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
TR22.05.2019
IE15.06.2019
LU15.06.2019
BE30.06.2019
CH30.06.2019
LI30.06.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
IS22.09.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2021/32]HU15.06.2009
AT22.05.2019
CY22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
PL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SI22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
TR22.05.2019
IE15.06.2019
LU15.06.2019
BE30.06.2019
CH30.06.2019
LI30.06.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
IS22.09.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2021/31]AT22.05.2019
CY22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
PL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SI22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
TR22.05.2019
IE15.06.2019
LU15.06.2019
BE30.06.2019
CH30.06.2019
LI30.06.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
IS22.09.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2021/26]AT22.05.2019
CY22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
PL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SI22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
TR22.05.2019
IE15.06.2019
LU15.06.2019
BE30.06.2019
CH30.06.2019
LI30.06.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2020/25]AT22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
PL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SI22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
TR22.05.2019
IE15.06.2019
LU15.06.2019
BE30.06.2019
CH30.06.2019
LI30.06.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2020/21]AT22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
TR22.05.2019
IE15.06.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2020/17]AT22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
TR22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2020/14]AT22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
MC22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2020/11]AT22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
EE22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
SK22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2020/10]AT22.05.2019
CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RO22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2020/09]CZ22.05.2019
DK22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/51]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
BG22.08.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/50]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/49]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102004058588  (KUERTEN CLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US5814792  (WILDI THEODORE [CA]) [X] 1-11 * column 13, line 46 - column 19, line 67 * * figures 16a-19a *;
 [X]JP2005192825  (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0827364  (WILHELM FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003178415  (HAYS KENNETH M [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
ExaminationCH667733
by applicantDE102004058588
 US5814792
 JP2005192825
 CH667733
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.