blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2239779

EP2239779 - Flexible image-sensing module with anti-EMI function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/41]Flexible thin image-sensing module with anti-EMI function and flexible thin PCB module with anti-EMI function
[2017/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 01.07.2020  [2020/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Azurewave Technologies, Inc.
8F, No. 94, Baozhong Road
Xindian, Taipei / TW
[2017/21]
Former [2010/41]For all designated states
Azurewave Technologies, Inc.
8F, No. 94, Baozhong Road
Xindlan, Taipei / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Hsu, Chi-Hsing
8F, No.94, Baozhong Rd., Xindian
Taipei / TW
 [2017/21]
Former [2010/41]01 / Hsu, Chi-Hsing
8F, No.94, Baozhong Rd., Xindian
Taipei / TW
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2017/21]
Former [2010/41]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date09162940.217.06.2009
[2010/41]
Priority number, dateTW2009011164708.04.2009         Original published format: TW 98111647
[2010/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2239779
Date:13.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2239779
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2239779
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2012
ClassificationIPC:H05K1/18, H05K1/02, H01L27/146
[2017/02]
CPC:
H01L27/14618 (EP,US); H05K1/0218 (EP,US); H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,US); H05K1/0393 (EP,US); H05K1/189 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0715 (EP,US); H05K3/0058 (EP,US); H05K3/386 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2010/41]H01L27/146
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/21]
Former [2010/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flexibles Bildsensormodul mit Anti-EMI-Funktion[2017/02]
English:Flexible image-sensing module with anti-EMI function[2017/02]
French:Module de détection d'images souple doté d'une fonction anti-interférences électromagnétiques[2017/02]
Former [2010/41]Flexibles Dünnbildsensormodul mit Anti-EMI-Funktion und flexibles Dünn-PCB-Modul mit Anti-EMI-Funktion
Former [2010/41]Flexible thin image-sensing module with anti-EMI function and flexible thin PCB module with anti-EMI function
Former [2010/41]Module de détection d'images fin et souple doté d'une fonction anti-interférences électromagnétiques et module de PCB fin et souple doté d'une fonction anti-interférences électromagnétiques
Examination procedure07.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/08]
27.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2016
14.12.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2017Fee for grant paid
11.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2013
Opposition(s)27.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.06.2009
AT24.05.2017
CY24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
MK24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
PT24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
TR24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
[2020/27]
Former [2020/15]HU17.06.2009
AT24.05.2017
CY24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
MK24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
TR24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2019/52]HU17.06.2009
AT24.05.2017
CY24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
MK24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2019/46]HU17.06.2009
AT24.05.2017
CY24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2019/31]HU17.06.2009
AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2019/30]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/43]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/39]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
BE30.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/23]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/21]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
LU17.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9629202  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* page 5, line 24 - page 8, line 32; figure - *;
 [A]US2001017988  (TANAKA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 3, paragraph 31; figure - *;
 [A]US2003214802  (FJELSTAD JOSEPH C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 65 - page 5, paragraph 69; figures 2B, 2C *;
 [XY]JP2005303067  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 12 * abstract * [Y] 6,7,11,13-15;
 [Y]WO2006072518  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 6,7,11 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 27; figure - *;
 [Y]EP1951016  (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 13-15 * page 5, paragraph 23 - paragraph 31; figures 2, 3 *
ExaminationUS2004222352
 US2007119620
by applicantJP2005303067
 WO2006072518
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.