EP2146287 - Interface between a two-wire bus and a single-wire bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Rousset) SAS ZI de Peynier Rousset Avenue Coq 13790 Rousset / FR | For all designated states PROTON WORLD INTERNATIONAL N.V. Excelsiorlaan 44-46 1930 Zaventem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Rousset) SAS ZI de Peynier Rousset Avenue Coq 13790 Rousset / FR | ||
For all designated states PROTON WORLD INTERNATIONAL N.V. Excelsiorlaan 44-46 1930 ZAVENTEM / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laurencin, Christophe / 14, Avenue de la Libération 13124, Peypin / FR | 02 /
Modave, Jean-Louis / 56, Rue du Petit Ry 1340, Ottignies / BE | [2012/04] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
Laurencin, Christophe 14, Avenue de la Libération 13124, Peypin / FR | ||
02 /
Modave, Jean-Louis 56, Rue du Petit Ry 1340, Ottignies / BE | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2012/04] |
Former [2010/03] | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 09163517.7 | 23.06.2009 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | FR20080054820 | 16.07.2008 Original published format: FR 0854820 | [2010/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146287 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146287 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F13/40 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G06F13/4282 (EP,US);
G06F13/4027 (EP,US);
G06F2213/0016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | Schnittstelle zwischen einem Doppelleitungsbus und einem Einzelleitungsbus | [2010/03] | English: | Interface between a two-wire bus and a single-wire bus | [2010/03] | French: | Interface entre un bus bifilaire et un bus unifilaire | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2009 | AT | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | HR | 25.01.2012 | IE | 25.01.2012 | IT | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MK | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | NL | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | NO | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | LU | 23.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
LU | 23.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MK | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6066964 (MENEGHINI THOMAS L [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 40 * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2007004178 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9* figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0798901 | US5903607 | US6066964 |