Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2099250

EP2099250 - Method and apparatus for call setup latency reduction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2009/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Sinnarajah, Ragulan
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
02 / Tiedemann, Edward G., Jr.
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
03 / Rezaiifar, Ramin
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
04 / Wang, Jun
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
05 / Ho, Duncan
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
 [2012/13]
Former [2009/37]01 / Sinnarajah, Ragulan
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
02 / Tiedemann, Edward G., Jr.
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
03 / Rezaiifar, Ramin
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
04 / Wang, Jun
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
05 / Ho, Duncan
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/13]Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Former [2009/37]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date09164170.416.08.2002
[2009/37]
Priority number, dateUS2001093347317.08.2001         Original published format: US 933473
[2009/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2099250
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2099250
Date:28.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/02
[2009/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2009/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Zeitreduktion eines Verbindungsaufbaues[2009/37]
English:Method and apparatus for call setup latency reduction[2009/37]
French:Procédé er appareil permettant une réduction du temps d'établissement d'une communication[2009/37]
Examination procedure07.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/08]
05.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2012Fee for grant paid
09.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02757143.9  / EP1417857
Divisional application(s)EP10012154.0  / EP2302977
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020757143) is  24.10.2005
Opposition(s)03.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.09.2010Request for further processing filed
07.09.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE16.08.2012
LU16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/46]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/40]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
FR31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/33]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE16.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/20]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
PT30.07.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/16]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/11]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/01]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2012/50]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/49]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/46]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI28.03.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/36]GR29.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1052867  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 17, paragraph 9 - column 3, line 18, paragraph 13 * * column 6, line 38, paragraph 28 - column 8, line 29, paragraph 39 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0888026  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 12 - line 45 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 25 * * figures 2,3a; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US5854785  (WILLEY WILLIAM DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 35 * * figure 3 *
by applicantEP1052867
 EP0888026