Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2144201

EP2144201 - Image processing apparatus and image processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2010/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Urashima, Hiroki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
 [2010/02]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Derham, Cassandra Virginie
Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex
UB11 1ET / GB
Application number, filing date09164513.503.07.2009
[2010/02]
Priority number, dateJP2008017840408.07.2008         Original published format: JP 2008178404
[2010/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2144201
Date:13.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2144201
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/60, G06F17/30, H04N1/387
[2012/46]
Former International [2010/02]G06T11/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Bildverarbeitungsverfahren[2010/02]
English:Image processing apparatus and image processing method[2010/02]
French:Appareil et procédé de traitement d'images[2010/02]
Examination procedure14.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/26]
05.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/25]
10.05.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.06.2019
24.06.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2006098417  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13 * In particular pages 46 to 50 * [Y] 9 [I] 8;
 [XYI]  - DAVE GROSVENOR, "The use of a cast to generate person-biased photo-albums", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20060901), vol. 509, no. 64, ISSN 0374-4353, page 1238, XP007136653 [X] 1-7,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 9 [I] 8,10
 [XYI]  - DAVE GROSVENOR AND SUSANNE KLEIN, "The use of a cast to generate person-biased video presentations", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20060901), vol. 509, no. 62, ISSN 0374-4353, page 1235, XP007136651 [X] 1-7,10-13 * the whole document * [Y] 9 [I] 8
 [Y]  - GEIGEL J ET AL, "Automatic Page Layout Using Genetic Algorithms for Electronic Albuming", SPIE PROCEEDINGS, THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING - SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASHINGTON, USA, (20020101), vol. 4311, doi:10.1117/12.411879, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 79 - 90, XP002346380 [Y] 9 * In particular Section 4.3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.411879
by applicantJP2007019894
 WO2006098417
    - "The Use of a Cast to Generate Person-biased Photo-Albums", DAVE GROSVENOR, RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, (20060901), vol. 509, page 1238
    - GEIGEL; LOUI, "Automatic Page Layout Using Genetic Algorithms for Electronic Albuming", SPIE PROCEEDINGS, THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING - SPIE BELLINGHAM, (20020101), vol. 4311, doi:doi:10.1117/12.411879, pages 79 - 90, XP002346380

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.411879