blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2105439 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2105439



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 812
29.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.04.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.04.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.04.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
11.04.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 31
06.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
06.02.2019 Amended description with annotations Appeal 8
06.02.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.02.2019 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.02.2019 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.02.2019 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 8
18.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.01.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 11
17.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
17.01.2019 Notice of opposition Appeal 2
17.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 2
14.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.01.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
14.01.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
10.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.12.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.12.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
21.12.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
21.12.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
21.12.2018 Claims Appeal 10
21.12.2018 Claims Appeal 10
21.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.12.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
08.11.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 15
08.11.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 15
28.09.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.09.2018 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
21.09.2018 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
18.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.09.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
07.09.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
04.09.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.07.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.01.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.01.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 11
28.01.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 14
28.01.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
28.01.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
15.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.10.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
09.10.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.10.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
09.10.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
15.04.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 15
15.04.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.04.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.04.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
15.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
15.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
15.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.02.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.09.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.09.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 3
15.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.09.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
15.09.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.09.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
16.05.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.05.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.05.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
12.05.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
02.04.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.04.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
28.03.2014 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
24.03.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.03.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
13.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.03.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
28.02.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
26.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
17.02.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.02.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
17.02.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.02.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
17.02.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 12
21.01.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.11.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.11.2013 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 13
15.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Claims Opposition 2
15.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.06.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
13.06.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.06.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.02.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
14.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.08.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.08.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.07.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.07.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.07.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
17.07.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
17.07.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.07.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.07.2012 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.09.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.09.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
29.08.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
29.08.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
27.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
27.07.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.07.2011 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
28.03.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
24.08.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
31.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.03.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
31.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.03.2010 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
02.10.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
23.09.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.09.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
28.08.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.08.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 2
28.08.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
10.07.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
10.07.2009 Annex Search / examination 5
10.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
10.07.2009 Description Search / examination 9
10.07.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
18.10.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14