Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2105439

EP2105439 - Method for the synthesis of organic acid esters of 5-hydroxymethylfurfural [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  13.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Furanix Technologies B.V.
Zekeringstraat 29
1014 BV Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]For all designated states
Furanix Technologies B.V
Zekeringstraat 29
1014 BV Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Gruter, Gerardus Johannes Maria
14, Asterkade
2106 BA HEEMSTEDE / NL
02 / Dautzenberg, Frits
5008 Chelterham Ter
SAN DIEGO, CA 92130 / US
 [2011/42]
Former [2009/40]01 / Gruter, Gerardus Johannes Maria
14, Asterkade
2106 BA HEEMSTEDE / NL
02 / Dautzenberg, Frits
5008 Chelterham Ter
SAN DIEGO, CA 92130 / US
Representative(s)EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[2014/44]
Former [2011/42]Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A.
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Former [2009/40]Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A.
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. Postbus 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date09165171.112.03.2007
[2009/40]
Priority number, dateEP2006007556510.03.2006         Original published format: EP 06075565
[2009/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2105439
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2105439
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07D307/46, C07D307/50
[2009/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Synthese organischer Säureester von 5-Hydroxymethylfurfural[2009/40]
English:Method for the synthesis of organic acid esters of 5-hydroxymethylfurfural[2009/40]
French:Procédé de synthèse d'esters d'acide organique du 5-hydroxyméthylfurfural[2009/40]
Examination procedure22.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/17]
31.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2011Fee for grant paid
27.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07723191.8  / EP2001859
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070723191) is  26.01.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.07.2012  20.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
4666 Faries Parkway
Decatur
Illinois 62526 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp, et al
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [2017/28]
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2012  20.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
4666 Faries Parkway Decatur
Illinois 62526 / US
Opponent's representative
Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran, et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2014/16]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2012  20.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
4666 Faries Parkway Decatur
Illinois 62526 / US
Opponent's representative
Duckworth, Timothy John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2012/34]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2012   
Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
4666 Faries Parkway Decatur
Illinois 62526 / US
Opponent's representative
McCluskie, Gail Wilson
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
27.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
17.02.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.02.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.01.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/21]
11.04.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0725/14
12.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
21.01.2019Date of oral proceedings
06.02.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.03.2007
AT19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
MT19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
TR19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE12.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/21]AT19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
MT19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
TR19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE12.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2013/35]AT19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
MT19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE12.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2013/29]AT19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE12.03.2012
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
MC31.03.2012
Former [2012/34]CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/28]CY19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/24]LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/23]LT19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/21]LT19.10.2011
IS19.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT19.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB925812  (MERCK & CO INC) [X] 1-19 * page 1, column L, line 10 - page 1, column R, line 28 * * page 1, column L, line 49 - page 1, column L, line 55; example II * [Y] 1-19;
 [Y]DE3621517  (GARVES KLAUS DIPL CHEM DR [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * claims 1-9 *
 [XY]  GARVES K, "Acid catalyzed degradation of cellulose in alcohols", JOURNAL OF WOOD CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, MARCEL DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1988), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 0277-3813, pages 121 - 134, XP009067962 [XY] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [Y]  TYRLIK S S K ET AL, "Selective dehydration of glucose to hydroxymethylfurfural and a one-pot synthesis of a 4-acetylbutyrolactone from glucose and trioxane in solutions of aluminium salts", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990228), vol. 315, no. 3-4, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 268 - 272, XP004174265 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(99)00037-3