EP2107490 - System and method for providing code signing services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [2012/35] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirkup, Michael G. 224 Dearborn Boulevard Waterloo Ontario N2J 4Y3 / CA | 02 /
Little, Herb 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | 03 /
Tapuska, David 712 Willow Wood Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2T7 / CA | 04 /
Adams, Neil 550 Little Dover Crescent Waterloo Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA | [2012/35] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Kirkup, Michael G. 224 Dearborn Boulevard Waterloo Ontario N2J 4Y3 / CA | ||
02 /
Little, Herb 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | |||
03 /
Tapuska, David 712 Willow Wood Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2T7 / CA | |||
04 /
Adams, Neil 550 Little Dover Crescent Waterloo Ontario N2K 4E4 / CA | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2009/41] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 09166462.3 | 29.09.2005 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107490 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107490 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2107490 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2107490 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/22, G06F21/00 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
G06F21/42 (EP);
G06F21/645 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/41] | G06F21/24, G06F21/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Codesignierungsdiensten | [2009/41] | English: | System and method for providing code signing services | [2009/41] | French: | Système et procédé de fourniture de services de signature numérique de code | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 05.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05109041.3 / EP1770589 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050109041) is 28.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2005 | AT | 29.08.2012 | BE | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | IT | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | PL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | IE | 29.09.2012 | LU | 29.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | ES | 10.12.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
LU | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9959286 (CERTICOM CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0113574 (ACCELA COM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6367012 (ATKINSON ROBERT G [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6453416 (EPSTEIN MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP1318488 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081]; figures 4,5 *; | [E]WO2006000531 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [E] 1-11 * page 11, line 27 - page 13, line 24 *; | [A] - "AUTHENTICATED CONTENT SIGNING FOR SYMBIAN", INTERNET CITATION, (20050308), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20050308164449/www.verisign.com/products-services/security-services/code-signing/symbian-content-signing/index.html, (20060207), XP002367140 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6367012 | US6453416 | EP1318488 | WO2006000531 |