Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2284831

EP2284831 - Method and device for active noise reduction using perceptual masking [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/07]Active noise reduction method using perceptual masking
[2011/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2013
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2011/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Doclo, Simon
c/o NXP Semiconductors
High Tech Campus 32
5656, AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2012/12]
Former [2011/07]01 / Doclo, Simon
c/o NXP Semiconductors High Tech Campus 32
5656, AE Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)Krott, Michel , et al
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2011/07]Krott, Michel , et al
NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date09166902.830.07.2009
[2011/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2284831
Date:16.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2284831
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:G10K11/178
[2011/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur aktiven Geräuschsminderung unter Anwendung von Wahrnehmungsmaskierung[2011/44]
English:Method and device for active noise reduction using perceptual masking[2011/44]
French:Procédé et dispositif de réduction active de bruit utilisant un masquage perceptuel[2011/44]
Former [2011/07]Aktives Geräuschsminderungsverfahren unter Anwendung von Wahrnehmungsmaskierung
Former [2011/07]Active noise reduction method using perceptual masking
Former [2011/07]Procédé de réduction active de bruit utilisant un masquage perceptuel
Examination procedure03.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2011Examination requested  [2011/38]
02.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2012Fee for grant paid
10.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.11.2011
Opposition(s)02.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2009
AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MK21.03.2012
MT21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
SM21.03.2012
TR21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
LU30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MK21.03.2012
MT21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
SM21.03.2012
TR21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
LU30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2014/21]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MK21.03.2012
MT21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
TR21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/35]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MK21.03.2012
MT21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/33]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MK21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/22]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MK21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
ES02.07.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/12]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MK21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/11]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
DK21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT21.03.2012
BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2013/01]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2012/50]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
Former [2012/49]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
Former [2012/48]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/46]BE21.03.2012
CY21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[XAI]GB2455822  (WOLFSON MICROELECTRONICS PLC [GB]) [X] 1-2,6,9,11-12,14-15 * page 4, line 4 - page 7, line 44; figures 1-2 * * page 13, line 22 - page 15, line 4; figure 3 * [A] 3 [I] 4-5,7-8,10,13;
 [XA]US2008186218  (OHKURI KAZUNOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-7,9,14-15 * paragraphs [0102] - [0108]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0118] - [0125]; figure 8 * [A] 3;
 [XA]JP2008137636  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,6-7,9,14-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] - [0074]; figure 5 * [A] 3;
 [A]JPH0511772  (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1770685  (MAYSOUND APS [DK]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *
by applicantGB2455822
 US2008186218
 JP2008137636
 WO2007038922