blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2243682

EP2243682 - Blower cart [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
1207 Drummond Plaza
Newark, Delaware 19711 / US
[2010/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Sergyeyenko, Oleksiy P.
376 Brock Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 6K6 / CA
02 / Covell, Kevin W.
5 Caribou Court
Parkton, MD 21120 / US
 [2010/43]
Representative(s)Bell, Ian Stephen, et al
Black & Decker
Patent Department
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/43]Bell, Ian Stephen, et al
Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Application number, filing date09167775.713.08.2009
[2010/43]
Priority number, dateUS2008019137614.08.2008         Original published format: US 191376
[2010/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2243682
Date:27.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2243682
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2015
ClassificationIPC:B62B1/14, B62B1/26, H02G3/32
[2015/32]
CPC:
B62B1/14 (EP,US); A01G20/47 (EP,US); B62B1/12 (EP,US);
H02G3/32 (EP,US); B62B1/008 (EP,US); B62B2202/48 (EP,US);
B62B2202/50 (EP,US); B62B2203/071 (EP,US); B62B2203/42 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2010/43]B62B1/14, B62B1/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2010/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Abblaswagen[2010/43]
English:Blower cart[2010/43]
French:Chariot de ventilateur[2010/43]
Examination procedure04.11.2009Request for decision received: Various
02.08.2010Result of request for decision (Various): Request rejected
29.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/10]
06.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
15.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2016/31]
Appeal following examination29.09.2010Appeal received No.  J0027/10
03.12.2010Statement of grounds filed
09.12.2011Date of oral proceedings
14.12.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4880364  (BERFIELD ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 3* column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 36; figures 12-14 *;
 [XA]EP0362895  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,11 * column 8, line 10 - column 9, line 40; figures 2,3,; claims 5,13,16 * [A] 3;
 [Y]EP0460537  (WIMA MASCHINEN UND GERAETEBAU [DE]) [Y] 1,2,11,13,14 * column 2, lines 11-20 - column 4, lines 19-24; claims 4,5,8 *;
 [YA]WO0106189  (MACOR RICHARD J [US]) [Y] 2 * page 6, lines 13-15 - page 9, lines 1-17; claims 17,29,30 * [A] 1,12,14;
 [YDA]US6185917  (GOUDES JAMES [US]) [YD] 1,11,13 * column 9, line 23 - column 10, line 33; figures 4,6 * [A] 5;
 [YD]US6442790  (SVOBODA STEVEN J [US], et al) [YD] 14 * paragraph [01st]; figure all *;
 [XA]US2003221400  (GALLENTINE BILL [US]) [X] 1,11,13 * paragraph [0044]; figure 3; claims 1,2,13 * [A] 3,5;
 [YDA]US2005132531  (HABERLEIN JURGEN [DE]) [YD] 1,2,11,13,14 * claims 13-15 * [A] 5,6,8
by applicantUS3618157
 US4118826
 US5294063
 US5722110
 USD410785S
 US6009595
 US6185917
 US6226833
 US2005132531
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.