Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2200282

EP2200282 - Broadcast processing apparatus and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2015New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2010/25]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Ko, Chang-seog
Sinyeongtong Hyundai Ap. No. 311-601
860 Banwol-dong, Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Won-il
Jugong Ap. No. 806-1005
Burim-dong, Gwacheon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Kwon, Yong-hwan
I-Park Bundang Ap. No. 202-2903
Jeongja-dong, Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2012/42]
Former [2010/25]01 / Ko, Chang-seog
Sinyeongtong Hyundai Ap. No. 311-601 860 Banwol-dong, Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Won-il
Jugong Ap. No. 806-1005 Burim-dong, Gwacheon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Kwon, Yong-hwan
I-Park Bundang Ap. No. 202-2903 Jeongja-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/42]Brandon, Paul Laurence
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB
Former [2010/25]Brandon, Paul Laurence
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date09168309.420.08.2009
[2010/25]
Priority number, dateKR2008012981919.12.2008         Original published format: KR 20080129819
[2010/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2200282
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2200282
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2200282
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/445, H04N5/50, H04N5/46
[2011/35]
Former International [2010/25]H04N5/445, H04N5/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/25]
TitleGerman:Rundfunkverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür[2010/25]
English:Broadcast processing apparatus and control method thereof[2010/25]
French:Appareil de traitement de diffusion et son procédé de commande[2010/25]
Examination procedure14.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/13]
29.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2012Fee for grant paid
04.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.05.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V.
Hohenzollernstr. 11-13
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Pröll, Jürgen
Die Patenterie GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Leibnizstrasse 6
95447 Bayreuth / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/03]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2013  30.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V.
Hohenzollernstr. 11-13
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Pröll, Jürgen
Maryniok & Eichstädt Anwaltssozietät Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
Former [2013/34]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2013   
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte e.V.
Hohenzollernstr. 11-13
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Mühläckerstr. 4a
96117 Memmelsdorf / DE
23.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.12.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.04.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1370/15
28.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.08.2009
AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
MK17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
SM17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE20.08.2013
LU20.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
MK17.10.2012
MT17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
SM17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE20.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2015/24]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
SM17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE20.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/33]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE20.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI17.10.2012
HR17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
LV17.10.2012
PL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI17.10.2012
LT17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
IS17.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
Former [2013/20]LT17.10.2012
NO17.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2005076610  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11,15 * abstract * * page 9, line 6 - page 13, line 10 * [I] 4-7,12-14;
 [A]US2005057698  (BAE SIMON [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1750438  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0051] , [0052] *
by applicantWO2005076610