blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2159174 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2159174



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1007
28.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.05.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
16.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.05.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 34
09.05.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.05.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.05.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.11.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.11.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.11.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.11.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 5
07.11.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
07.11.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
07.11.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
02.11.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
24.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.10.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Claims Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Claims Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Claims Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Claims Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Claims Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Claims Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Claims Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.10.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
12.10.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
11.10.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
06.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
06.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
01.09.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
29.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.08.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 18
24.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
11.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.08.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
01.08.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
01.08.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
31.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.07.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 15
25.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
24.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
24.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
19.07.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.07.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.08.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.05.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 15
03.05.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 32
03.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
13.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
08.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.04.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
08.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
02.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
23.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.02.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 53
17.02.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 53
17.02.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
17.02.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
17.02.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 37
17.02.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 37
09.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.11.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
03.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
30.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.10.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.09.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
03.07.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
03.07.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 19
03.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
02.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.06.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
02.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.06.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
01.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.05.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
28.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Communication of notices of intervention Opposition 1
27.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
27.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.04.2015 Intervention of the assumed infringer Opposition 12
27.04.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
27.04.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
10.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
07.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
07.04.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 18
07.04.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.09.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
01.09.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.09.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.09.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.03.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
05.03.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
28.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2013 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
22.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.10.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
03.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.04.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
25.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
19.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 88
24.05.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.04.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.04.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
27.04.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.12.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.12.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.12.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.12.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
02.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.09.2010 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.02.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.12.2009 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.12.2009 Priority document Search / examination 19
21.10.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.10.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.10.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 1
07.10.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
25.08.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.08.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
25.08.2009 Description Search / examination 6
25.08.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.08.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.08.2009 Drawings Search / examination 6
25.08.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5