Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2116276

EP2116276 - A public access defibrillator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.12.2013
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.01.2014  [2014/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cardiac Science Corporation
3303 Monte Villa Parkway
Bothell WA 98021-8906 / US
[2009/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, Dongping
13 Glenn Irvine
California, CA 92620 / US
02 / Ybarra, Raul
4 Dunlap Sound
Edwardsville, IL 62025 / US
03 / Mathur, Prabodh
27971 Greenlawn Circle
Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US
 [2009/46]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/12]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Former [2009/46]Perkins, Dawn Elizabeth , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date09168921.610.01.2001
[2009/46]
Priority number, dateUS2000059166912.06.2000         Original published format: US 591669
[2009/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2116276
Date:11.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2116276
Date:01.12.2010
[2010/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/39
[2009/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/46]
TitleGerman:Öffentlich zugänglicher Defibrillator[2009/46]
English:A public access defibrillator[2009/46]
French:Défibrillateur d'accès publique[2009/46]
Examination procedure31.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/28]
19.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/04]
19.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/04]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01906537.4  / EP1289603
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010906537) is  18.09.2006
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
19.09.2011Request for further processing filed
19.09.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.09.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5899925  (OCHS DENNIS E [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10,12,13 * column 1, line 8 - line 38 * * column 3, lines 17-46; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,8,9,11;
 [Y]US3703900  (HOLZNAGEL MELVIN A) [Y] 1-10,12-14 * column 1, line 20 - column 3, line 58 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 7; figures 1,1a,3 *;
 [Y]US5507778  (FREEMAN GARY A [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,12-14 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 50 * * column 4, lines 60-65; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO9947207  (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO9400182  (CARDIAC SCIENCE INC [US]) [Y] 2,8,9,11 * page 10, line 2 - line 7 * * page 18, line 2 - line 34 * * page 23, line 26 - page 24, line 36; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]EP0756878  (SURVIVALINK CORP [US]) [Y] 10,11 * column 3, line 18 - column 8, line 22; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO9909929  (EMERGENCY MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,4-7,9,12 * page 5, line 11 - line 17 * * page 6, line 18 - line 27 * * page 7, line 10 - line 20; figures 6,9 *
by applicantUS5474574