Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2292448

EP2292448 - Vehicle tyres for commercial vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  04.02.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2019Opposition rejectedpublished on 13.03.2019  [2019/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2011/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Kleffmann, Jens
Glünderstraße 14
30167, Hannover / DE
02 / Peters, Klaus
Juistweg 7
31303, Burgdorf / DE
03 / Buchinger-Barnstorf, Thomas
Jahnstraße 10
30974, Wennigsen / DE
 [2012/27]
Former [2011/10]01 / Kleffmann, Jens
Glünderstraße 14
30167, Hannover / DE
02 / Peters, Klaus
Juistweg 7
31303, Burgdorf / DE
03 / Buchinger-Barnstorf, Thomas
Jahnstraße 10
30974, Wennigsen / DE
Representative(s)Vinazzer, Edith , et al
Hölzlgasse 64-68/1
3400 Klosterneuburg / AT
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]Finger, Karsten
Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169
30001 Hannover / DE
Former [2011/10]Finger, Karsten
Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169
30001 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date09169199.802.09.2009
[2011/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2292448
Date:09.03.2011
Language:DE
[2011/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2292448
Date:04.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/04
[2011/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/10]
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugluftreifen für Nutzfahrzeuge[2011/10]
English:Vehicle tyres for commercial vehicles[2011/10]
French:Pneu de véhicule pour véhicules utilitaires[2011/10]
Examination procedure09.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/42]
28.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2012Fee for grant paid
21.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.04.2013  11.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A.
Route Louis Braille 10
1763 Granges-Paccot / CH
Opponent's representative
Millanvois, Patrick Jacques Jean
Manufacture Française des
Pneumatiques Michelin
CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux
23, place des Carmes-Déchaux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR
 [2018/37]
Former [2013/19]
Opponent(s)01  03.04.2013   
MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A.
Route Louis Braille 10
1763 Granges-Paccot / CH
Opponent's representative
Diernaz, Christian
M. F. P. Michelin
23, place des Carmes Dechaux
DGD/PI-F35-Ladoux
63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR
10.05.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.11.2018Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/11]
16.01.2019Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition04.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0530/16
20.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.11.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
10.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0530/16
10.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.11.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
28.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
04.01.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.09.2009
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MK04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE02.09.2012
LU02.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
GB02.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
AT02.09.2014
[2016/12]
Former [2015/32]HU02.09.2009
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MK04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE02.09.2012
LU02.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
GB02.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]HU02.09.2009
CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE02.09.2012
LU02.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
GB02.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/27]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE02.09.2012
LU02.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2014/21]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE02.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/51]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
IE02.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/34]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
IE02.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/33]CY04.07.2012
CZ04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
IE02.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/13]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
PT05.11.2012
Former [2013/12]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/11]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/10]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/09]FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
Former [2013/08]LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
Former [2012/51]SI04.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2100752  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [E] 1,6-8,17,19 * paragraphs [0035] , [0037] , [0039]; figures 2,4-7 *;
 [X]US2006005904  (HELT JEAN-NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 1,6-8,17,19 * paragraph [0042]; figures 2,3,7-12 *
by applicantUS5535798
 US2006005904
 EP2100752
 EP0973652