Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2292448 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2292448



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 740
08.02.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
28.01.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
25.01.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
16.01.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
16.01.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.01.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.01.2019 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 3
20.12.2018 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
19.12.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.12.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.12.2018 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 3
23.11.2018 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
23.11.2018 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
22.11.2018 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
22.11.2018 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
19.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
04.10.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
28.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.09.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.08.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
09.08.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
08.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
08.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
03.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.08.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
15.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.06.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
14.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.06.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
06.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.06.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.05.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.10.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.10.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
27.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.09.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
01.06.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.05.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
20.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.05.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.05.2016 Claims Appeal 3
10.05.2016 Claims Appeal 3
10.05.2016 Claims Appeal 3
10.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.05.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
06.05.2016 Annex to the communication Appeal 3
06.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
29.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
15.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
15.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
10.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.03.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
02.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
18.01.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
18.01.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 22
18.01.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
18.01.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
18.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
07.12.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
02.12.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
26.11.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
25.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
25.11.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 6
19.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.11.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Opposition 7
19.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
29.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.10.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
14.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
01.10.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
01.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
28.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.03.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
06.03.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.03.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.03.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
08.11.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
07.11.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
06.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.09.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.05.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
08.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 38
03.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.04.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.04.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
03.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.07.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.06.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.05.2012 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.05.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
21.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.03.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.03.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
19.03.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.03.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
06.12.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
06.12.2011 Description Search / examination 7
06.12.2011 Drawings Search / examination 2
06.12.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
28.09.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.03.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.02.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.11.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.11.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 2
10.11.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
04.11.2009 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
02.09.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.09.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
02.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
02.09.2009 Description Search / examination 16
02.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2009 Drawings Search / examination 9
02.09.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4