Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2131574 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2131574



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 297
02.04.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.03.2014 Closing of application Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.02.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 25
12.11.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
02.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 2
02.10.2013 Description Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
27.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.08.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
23.08.2013 F3050 Request to sign the notice of appeal Appeal 5
08.08.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.05.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.02.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.02.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
25.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.01.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
06.12.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.11.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
29.11.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
29.11.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
29.11.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.11.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
29.11.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
29.11.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
29.11.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
29.11.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
29.11.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
29.11.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.10.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
15.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.10.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
16.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2011 Description Search / examination 2
23.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
05.04.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.01.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.05.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 26
31.05.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
31.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.02.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 2
07.01.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
11.11.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.09.2009 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
04.09.2009 Description Search / examination 42
04.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Drawings Search / examination 16
04.09.2009 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34