Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2120041

EP2120041 - Analysis of a mixture of biological and/or chemical components using magnetic particles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.2014
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magnisense SE
140, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
[2012/34]
Former [2009/47]For all designated states
Magnisense Technology Limited
Gr. Xenopoulou 17 Totalserve House
Limassol / CY
Inventor(s)01 / Nikitin, Petr, Ivanovich
Ul. kargopolskaya, 10-287
127562 MOSCOW / RU
02 / Vetoshko, Petr, Mikhailovich
Ul. Bolshaya Pionerskaya 15-23
113054 MOSCOW / RU
 [2013/09]
Former [2009/47]01 / Nikitin, Petr, Ivanovich
Ul. kargopolskaya, 10-287
127562 MOSCOW / RU
02 / Vetoshko, Petr, Mikhailovich
Ul. Bolshaya Pionerskaya 15-23
113054 MOSCOW / RU
Representative(s)Colombet, Alain André , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
62, Rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/09]Colombet, Alain André , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [2009/47]Colombet, Alain André , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Application number, filing date09169524.707.03.2001
[2009/47]
Priority number, dateRU2000010551109.03.2000         Original published format: RU 2000105511
[2009/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2120041
Date:18.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2120041
Date:20.10.2010
[2010/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2120041
Date:27.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/00, G01N33/543, G01R33/12
[2010/42]
Former International [2009/47]G01N27/00, G01N33/543, G01N27/72
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2009/47]
TitleGerman:Analyse einer Mischung aus biologischen und/oder chemischen Komponenten mittels magnetischer Partikel[2009/47]
English:Analysis of a mixture of biological and/or chemical components using magnetic particles[2009/47]
French:Analyse d'un mélange de composants biologiques et/ou chimiques utilisant des particules magnétiques[2009/47]
Examination procedure04.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/47]
19.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2013Fee for grant paid
08.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01922159.7  / EP1262766
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010922159) is  01.04.2008
Opposition(s)28.11.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
16.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
22.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
TR27.02.2013
IE07.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
GR28.05.2013
PT27.06.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/07]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
IE07.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
GR28.05.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/52]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
GR28.05.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/48]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
GR28.05.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/47]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
GR28.05.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/40]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
GR28.05.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/38]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
GR28.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
GR28.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
Former [2013/34]SE27.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9927367  (KNOLL MEINHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 35, line 19 *;
 [Y]US4710752  (CORDERY ROBERT A [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 68 *;
 [Y]US5614824  (DAMES ANDREW [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 50 *;
 [Y]EP0459722  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - line 30 *;
 [AD]  - C. B. KRIZ ET AL., "Magnetic permeability measurements in bioanalysis and biosensors", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS., US, (19960601), vol. 68, no. 11, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1966 - 1970, XP000594183 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac951227t
by applicantUS5656429
 US120897
    - CH. B. KRIZ; K. RADEVIK; D. KRIZ, "Magnetic Permeability Measurements in Bioanalysis and Biosensors", ANAL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 68, pages 1966 - 1970
    - B. "KRIZJ; K. RADEVIK; D. KRIZ, "Magnetic Permeability Measurements in Bioanalysis and Biosensors", ANAL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 68, pages 1966 - 1970