Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2161239

EP2161239 - Semiconductor nanocrystals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.03.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[2014/18]
Former [2010/31]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique
25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Texier-Nogues, Isabelle
3 rue Belin
38000 Grenoble / FR
02 / Bernardin, Aude
5 rue André Abry
38000 Grenoble / FR
 [2014/18]
Former [2010/10]01 / Texier-Nogues, Isabelle
3 rue Belin
38000 Grenoble / FR
02 / Bernardin, Aude
5 rue André Abry
38000 Grenoble / FR
Representative(s)Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/18]Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P.
Cabinet Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2010/10]Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P.
Nony & Associés 3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date09169655.907.09.2009
[2010/10]
Priority number, dateFR2008005603008.09.2008         Original published format: FR 0856030
[2010/10]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2161239
Date:10.03.2010
Language:FR
[2010/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2161239
Date:30.04.2014
Language:FR
[2014/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:B82Y15/00, C07D249/16, C07D498/08, G01N33/58, C07D207/00, B82B3/00, C07D235/00
[2014/02]
Former International [2010/10]B82B3/00, C07D235/00, G01N33/58, C07D207/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/10]
TitleGerman:Halbleiternanokristalle[2010/10]
English:Semiconductor nanocrystals[2010/10]
French:Nanocristaux semi-conducteurs[2010/10]
Examination procedure05.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
07.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2014Fee for grant paid
20.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2015   
Hüttermann, Aloys
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2015/10]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
11.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.07.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition19.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2157/16
21.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.09.2009
AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MK30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE07.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU07.09.2009
AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE07.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU07.09.2009
AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE07.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2016/28]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE07.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2016/22]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE07.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
IE07.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2015/30]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
LU07.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/18]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
IT30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY30.04.2014
FI30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY30.04.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006115547  (DENDRITIC NANOTECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * * pages 6-13; figures 1-8 * * pages 23-58; claims 1-91 *;
 [Y]WO2008016371  (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * pages 4-13; claims 1-49 *;
 [Y]WO0028088  (BIOCRYSTAL LTD [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * pages 3-23; figures 1-8; claims 1-27 *;
 [YD]WO2006050262  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [YD] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 2 * * paragraphs [0042] , [0074] , [0075]; figures 1A,1B,4A,6; claims 1-27 *;
 [Y]WO2007125429  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2006110782  (BERTOZZI CAROLYN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [XP]US2008299046  (WHITE MEGHANN A [US], et al) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - VUNDYALA NEERAJA ET AL, "Biotin-functional oligo(p-phenylene vinylene)s synthesized using click chemistry", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (20080828), vol. 49, no. 45, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 6386 - 6389, XP002531564 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * * abstract * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.TETLET.2008.08.080
 [Y]  - LI M ET AL, "Responsive polymer-protein bioconjugates prepared by RAFT polymerization and copper-catalyzed azide-alkyne click chemistry", MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS 20080701 WILEY-VCH VERLAG DE, (20080701), vol. 29, no. 12-13, pages 1172 - 1176, XP002531190 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/MARC.200800073
 [Y]  - KOLB H C ET AL, "The growing impact of click chemistry on drug discovery", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, (20031215), vol. 8, no. 24, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 1128 - 1137, XP002377521 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(03)02933-7
 [Y]  - CODELLI JULIAN A ET AL, "Second-generation difluorinated cyclooctynes for copper-free click chemistry.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 27 AUG 2008, (20080827), vol. 130, no. 34, ISSN 1520-5126, pages 11486 - 11493, XP002531600 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA803086R
 [Y]  - RANJAN R ET AL, "Combination of living radical polymerization and click chemistry for surface modification", MACROMOLECULES 20070821 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY US, (20070821), vol. 40, no. 17, pages 6217 - 6223, XP002531189 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/MA0705873
by applicantWO2006050262
    - BINDER, W. H. ET AL., JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 17, no. 20, pages 2125 - 2132