Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2163403 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2163403



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 492
12.11.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.11.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.11.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.11.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.11.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
09.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.11.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
30.10.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 14
30.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.10.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.10.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.10.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
18.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.08.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
29.08.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
10.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
20.06.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
20.06.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
14.06.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
13.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.06.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
11.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.06.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.06.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.05.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.05.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
08.02.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
08.11.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.08.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 14
13.07.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.04.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.04.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 31
13.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.04.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.04.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
26.02.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 2
25.02.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
08.02.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.02.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
04.12.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
04.12.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
04.12.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.10.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.09.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
28.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.02.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
06.02.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.02.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 19
12.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.09.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
10.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.05.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
12.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.04.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
04.04.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 32
17.10.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.07.2012 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
08.06.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
15.05.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.01.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.01.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.01.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.01.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
02.02.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.02.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.02.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
16.08.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.07.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.07.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
13.07.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
17.02.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.12.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.2009 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
15.12.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.12.2009 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
03.12.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
16.11.2009 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
24.10.2009 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.10.2009 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
06.10.2009 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 2
14.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
11.09.2009 Description Search / examination 7
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Drawings Search / examination 13
11.09.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5