Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2306319

EP2306319 - Database server, replication server and method for replicating data of a database server by at least one replication server [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2013
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2011/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Kreuder, Heinz
/ Am steinernen Kreuz 14D
64409 Messel / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald Dr.
/ Theobaldstr. 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
 [2012/23]
Former [2011/14]01 / Kreuder, Heinz
Am steinernen Kreuz 14D
64409 Messel / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald Dr.
Theobaldstr. 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/23]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Former [2011/14]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date09170180.514.09.2009
[2011/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2306319
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2306319
Date:06.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14, G06F11/20
[2011/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/14]
TitleGerman:Datenbankserver, Replikationsserver und Verfahren zur Datenreplikation eines Datenbankservers von mindestens einem Replikationsserver[2011/14]
English:Database server, replication server and method for replicating data of a database server by at least one replication server[2011/14]
French:Serveur de base de données, serveur de réplication et procédé de réplication de données d'un serveur de base de données d'au moins un serveur de réplication[2011/14]
Examination procedure14.09.2009Examination requested  [2011/14]
06.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2012Fee for grant paid
18.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.01.2012
Opposition(s)07.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.09.2009
AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
SM06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IE14.09.2012
LU14.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
[2015/32]
Former [2014/34]HU14.09.2009
AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
SM06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IE14.09.2012
LU14.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2014/27]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
SM06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IE14.09.2012
LU14.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2014/21]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IE14.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/51]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IE14.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/40]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IE14.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/34]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IE14.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/33]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IE14.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/22]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
ES17.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/21]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/20]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
IT06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
Former [2013/10]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
Former [2013/09]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2013/08]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
NL06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT06.06.2012
BE06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
Former [2012/47]LT06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6304882  (STRELLIS ERIC G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-13,15 * column 3, line 10 - line 45 * * column 4, line 15 - line 36 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 8 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 10 * * column 7, line 41 - line 55 * * column 23, line 8 - column 24, line 49 * * figures 1a,1b,2,15-17 * [A] 3,5,14;
 [DXA]US2007162516  (THIEL GREGORY I [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0016] , [0017] * * claims 1-4,7 * * figures 2,5 * [A] 3-10,12,14
by applicantUS2007162516
 US2004098425
 US2005114285