Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2306319 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2306319



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 149
10.04.2013 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.05.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.04.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.04.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
18.04.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
30.01.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.01.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.01.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.01.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
06.10.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
06.10.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
06.10.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
06.10.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
16.08.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
11.04.2011 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
09.03.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.11.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.11.2009 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.11.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 8
23.11.2009 European search report Search / examination 1
21.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
14.09.2009 Description Search / examination 22
14.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.09.2009 Drawings Search / examination 10
14.09.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5