Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2306319


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
30.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
15.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
30.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2013  [2013/40]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
12.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
26.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
19.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
12.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
12.04.2013 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
22.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2013  [2013/13]
08.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2013  [2013/11]
01.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
25.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2013  [2013/09]
18.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
11.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
16.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2012  [2012/51]
09.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
02.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
26.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.11.2012  [2012/48]
19.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2012  [2012/47]
04.05.2012 (Expected) grant published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
26.04.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.04.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.01.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.10.2011 Amendment by applicant
27.09.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.03.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.04.2011  [2011/14]
04.03.2011 Request for examination filed published on  06.04.2011  [2011/14]
23.10.2009 Change - representative published on  25.11.2009  [2009/48]