blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2163420

EP2163420 - Power seat system for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2018  [2018/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP
[2010/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Sakai, Morio
c/o Intellectual Property Department, AISIN SEIKI K.K. 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP
02 / Mori, Masaki
c/o Intellectual Property Department, AISIN SEIKI K.K. 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP
03 / Maeda, Toshiro
c/o Intellectual Property Department, AISIN SEIKI K.K. 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP
 [2010/11]
Representative(s)Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158 rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/11]Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date09170345.415.09.2009
[2010/11]
Priority number, dateJP2008023654016.09.2008         Original published format: JP 2008236540
[2010/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2163420
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2163420
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2017
ClassificationIPC:B60N2/00, B60N2/02
[2010/11]
CPC:
B60N2/0228 (EP,US); B60N2/0028 (EP,US); B60N2/02246 (EP,US);
B60N2/0233 (EP,US); B60N2/0239 (EP); B60N2/0244 (EP,US);
B60N2210/12 (EP,US); B60N2210/14 (EP,US); B60N2210/18 (EP);
B60N2210/24 (EP,US); B60N2210/26 (EP); B60N2220/20 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/11]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:System für elektrisch verstellbaren Fahrzeugsitz[2010/11]
English:Power seat system for vehicle[2010/11]
French:Système de siège électrique pour véhicule[2010/11]
Examination procedure13.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/16]
24.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201709   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006061315  (SCHMIDT ROBERT M [US], et al);
 [XYI]US2007168089  (GOLDBECK KAI [DE], et al);
 [Y]US2007235297  (STOSCHEK ARNE [US], et al);
 [A]EP1950783  (AISIN AW CO [JP]);
 [A]US2008186282  (NIX AXEL [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.