Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2302534

EP2302534 - Method for mass-deleting data records of a database system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2011/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Andreas
Am Brunnenberg 1
63762, Großostheim / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstr. 36
64807, Dieburg / DE
 [2017/50]
Former [2011/13]01 / Schmidt, Andreas
Am Brunnenberg 1
63762, Großostheim / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstr. 36
64807, Dieburg / DE
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2017/50]
Former [2011/13]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date09170678.818.09.2009
[2011/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2302534
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2302534
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2011/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/50]
Former [2011/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Massenlöschen von Dateneinträgen eines Datenbanksystems[2011/13]
English:Method for mass-deleting data records of a database system[2011/13]
French:Procédé pour effacer massivement des registres de données dans un système de base de données[2011/13]
Examination procedure18.09.2009Examination requested  [2011/13]
30.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2017Fee for grant paid
02.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.01.2012
Opposition(s)14.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
12.06.2013Request for further processing filed
12.06.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.07.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
[2018/51]
Former [2018/40]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/39]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/24]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/21]FI13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
NO13.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006235887  (ABE KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,13-14 * claims 3,5,6 *;
 [Y]US7502972  (CHILUKURI SAMPATH KUMAR [IN], et al) [Y] 1-5,8-14 * column 1, line 44 - line 53 *;
 [Y]  - Randy Cunningham, "Deleting LOTS of Data", (20081115), SageLogix inc., URL: http://www.sagelogix.com/idc/groups/public/documents/sagelogix-whitepaper/sage015051.pdf, (20100108), XP002562144 [Y] 1-5,8-14 * Introduction, sections "Consider an INSERT of what you want to keep" and "Consider partitioning" *
 [A]  - Boris Milrud, "Optimize the Massive DELETE Operation in Oracle, Part 2", (20041201), devx.com, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080308014321/http://www.devx.com/dbzone/Article/22614/1954?pf=true, (20100106), XP002561997 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Donald Burleson, "Oracle delete performance tips", (20081025), Burleson Consulting, dba-oracle.com, URL: http://www.dba-oracle.com/t_delete_performance_speed.htm, (20100106), XP002561998 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GARTNER A ET AL, "Efficient bulk deletes in relational databases", PROCEEDINGS 17TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE'2001). HEIDELBERG, GERMANY, APRIL 2 - 6, 2001; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE)], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20010402), ISBN 978-0-7695-1001-9, pages 183 - 192, XP010538060 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * Section 1.1-1.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2001.914827
ExaminationUS2006074956
 US2008243966
    - Anonymous, "Truncate (SQL)", (20090909), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Truncate_(SQL)&oldid=312812279, (20130710), XP055070617
    - Anonymous, "What is the use of truncate command?", (20081212), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://sawaal.ibibo.com/computers-and-technology/what-use-truncate-command-608470.html, (20130725), XP055072977