Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2302534


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
19.10.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
10.11.2017 (Expected) grant published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
06.11.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.11.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.11.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.06.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.12.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.07.2013 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
17.06.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
17.06.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
14.06.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.04.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
11.12.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.09.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.08.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.07.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.06.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.01.2012 First examination report
19.01.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.10.2011 Amendment by applicant
27.09.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.03.2011  [2011/13]
25.02.2011 Request for examination filed published on  30.03.2011  [2011/13]
23.10.2009 Change - representative published on  25.11.2009  [2009/48]