Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2302534 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201010289518 EP09170678



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9626394Global Dossier 18.04.2017B2
US2011071986 24.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP09170678 18.09.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN102024015Global Dossier 20.04.2011A
Priority number Date
EP09170678 18.09.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2302534Global Dossier 13.12.2017B1
EP2302534 30.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP09170678 18.09.2009