Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2133408

EP2133408 - Rinse agent composition and method for rinsing a substrate surface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ECOLAB INC.
Ecolab Center
St. Paul, MN 55102 / US
[2017/06]
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
ECOLAB INC.
Ecolab Center
St. Paul, MN 55102 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lentsch, Steven E.
21 Orme Court
St. Paul MN 55116 / US
02 / Man, Victor F.
Apartment 207, 1410 Carling Drive
St. Paul MN 55108 / US
03 / Killeen, Yvonne M.
216 East Douglas Street
South St. Paul MN 55075 / US
 [2017/06]
Former [2009/51]01 / Lentsch, Steven E.
21 Orme Court
St. Paul MN 55116 / US
02 / Man, Victor F.
Apartment 207, 1410 Carling Drive
St. Paul MN 55108 / US
03 / Killeen, Yvonne M.
216 East Douglas Street
South St. Paul MN 55075 / US
Representative(s)Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent
An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
[2017/06]
Former [2013/52]Godemeyer Blum Lenze - werkpatent
An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
Former [2012/02]Polypatent
An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
Former [2010/02]Polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2009/51]Herz, Sabine
polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date09172178.707.06.2001
[2009/51]
Priority number, dateUS2000060629029.06.2000         Original published format: US 606290
[2009/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2133408
Date:16.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2133408
Date:08.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/94, C11D1/83, // C11D1/10, C11D1/90, C11D1/66
[2016/34]
Former International [2009/51]C11D1/94, C11D1/83
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2017/06]
Former [2009/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Klarspülmittelzusammensetzung und Verfahren zum Klarspülen einer Substratoberfläche[2009/51]
English:Rinse agent composition and method for rinsing a substrate surface[2009/51]
French:Composition de produit de rinçage et procedé de rinçage de la surface d'un substrate[2009/51]
Examination procedure05.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/51]
23.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2016Fee for grant paid
22.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01942003.3  / EP1294836
Divisional application(s)EP17152656.9  / EP3196281
EP18206912.0  / EP3461880
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010942003) is  19.10.2005
Opposition(s)09.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
05.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
05.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
05.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
05.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
07.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
01.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.02.2017
DK08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
GR09.05.2017
IE07.06.2017
LU07.06.2017
PT08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2018/23]DK08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
GR09.05.2017
IE07.06.2017
LU07.06.2017
PT08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]DK08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
GR09.05.2017
LU07.06.2017
PT08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/11]DK08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
MC08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2018/01]DK08.02.2017
FI08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Former [2017/42]FI08.02.2017
SE08.02.2017
GR09.05.2017
PT08.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9532271  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 5,6 *;
 [X]EP0432836  (UNILEVER NV [NL]; UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 1 - line 3; example 20 *;
 [X]EP0486786  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * example 5 *;
 [X]US5759979  (SCHMID KARL [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,12,13,15 * example 4 *;
 [X]EP0341071  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,6,8,12,13,15 * example 2 *;
 [X]WO9111506  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,8,12,13,15 * example 25 *;
 [X]EP0698660  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,12 * example 20 *;
 [X]DE4333369  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,12 * example 25 *;
 [A]WO9610068  (ECOLAB INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5602093  (HAERER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 5-11 *;
 [A]WO9608553  (ECOLAB INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * example II *;
 [A]US5534199  (WINKLER III J A [US]) [A] 1-15 * example 1; claim 6 *
by applicantUS5589099
 US5447648
 US5739099
 US5712244
 US5545352
 US5273677
 US5516452
 US4647258