Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2306784

EP2306784 - Method for supplying power to induction cooking zones of an induction cooking hob having a plurality of power converters, and induction cooking hob using such method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Whirlpool Corporation
2000 M 63
Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US
For all designated states
TEKA Industrial S.A.
Cajo 17
39011 Santander / ES
[2011/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Parachini, Davide
Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio / IT
02 / Del Bello, Francesco
Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio / IT
03 / De Angelis, Andrea
Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio / IT
04 / Paderno, Jurij
Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio / IT
 [2011/14]
Representative(s)Spina, Alessandro , et al
Whirlpool EMEA SpA
Via Carlo Pisacane, 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2011/14]Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Application number, filing date09172198.505.10.2009
[2011/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2306784
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/06
[2011/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Lieferung von Energie an Induktionskochbereiche eines Induktionskochfelds mit mehreren Stromwandlern und Induktionskochfeld mit diesem Verfahren[2011/14]
English:Method for supplying power to induction cooking zones of an induction cooking hob having a plurality of power converters, and induction cooking hob using such method[2011/14]
French:Procédé de fourniture de puissance à des zones de cuisson par induction d'une plaque de cuisson par induction dotée d'une pluralité de convertisseurs de puissance, et plaque de cuisson par induction utilisant ledit procédé[2011/14]
Examination procedure05.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/41]
22.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination21.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1803/15
17.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.09.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
19.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2009090152  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1-2,6-7 * the whole document * [A] 5,10 [I] 3-4,8-9;
 [A]WO2006117182  (EGO ELEKTRO GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102004003126  (EGO ELEKTRO GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *
by applicantEP1895814
 WO2005043737
 EP1951003