blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2308642

EP2308642 - Grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2014
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zahnd, Hans-Peter
Rüteliweg 13
4207 Bretzwil / CH
[2011/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2011/15]
Representative(s)Graf, Werner
Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
[2013/49]
Former [2011/15]Graf, Werner
Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Application number, filing date09172477.307.10.2009
[2011/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2308642
Date:13.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2308642
Date:04.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2010
ClassificationIPC:B24B3/54
[2011/15]
CPC:
B24B3/54 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/15]
TitleGerman:Schleifmaschine[2011/15]
English:Grinding machine[2011/15]
French:Affûteuse[2011/15]
Examination procedure25.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/48]
14.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2013Fee for grant paid
09.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2011
Opposition(s)05.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
MT, EE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
25.10.2011Request for further processing filed
25.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.11.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
25.10.2011Request for further processing filed
25.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.11.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.10.2009
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MK04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU07.10.2009
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/32]HU07.10.2009
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/28]BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/22]CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2015/27]CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2015/14]CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/48]CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/37]CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/36]CY04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
Former [2014/26]CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/25]FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0349017  (FRIEL DANIEL D) [X] 1 * column 11, line 12 - line 49 * [Y] 8-13;
 [Y]US2007197148  (FRIEL DANIEL D [US]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-9 *;
 [Y]US2006276110  (FRIEL DANIEL D SR [US], et al) [Y] 11-13 * paragraph [0038]; figure 16A *
by applicantEP0349017
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.