Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2143482

EP2143482 - Composite materials comprising supported porous gels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.01.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2020New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Millipore Ltd.
Tullagreen
County Cork
Carrigtwohill / IE
[2019/46]
Former [2010/02]For all designated states
Natrix Separations Inc.
5295 John Lucas Drive Unit 6
Burlington ON L7L 6A8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Childs, Ronald F.
701 Garrett Road
QUALICUM BEACH British Columbia V9K 1L4 / CA
02 / Felipe, Carlos
574 Stonehenge Drive
ANCASTER Ontario L9K 0B2 / CA
03 / Ghosh, Raja
25 Morwick Drive
ANCASTER Ontario L9G 4Y3 / CA
04 / Mika, Alicja M.
25 Brodrick Street
HAMILTON Ontario L9S 3E3 / CA
05 / Zhou, Jinsheng
3122 Torrey Drive
Woodbury, MN 55125 / US
06 / Komkova, Elena N.
1967 Main Street West, Unit 42
HAMILTON Ontario L8S 4P4 / CA
07 / Kim, Marcus
45 4497 Credit Pointe Dr., Unit 42
MISSISSAUGA Ontario L5M 3M3 / CA
08 / Dey, Tapan
10 B Kamet Anushaktinager
Mumbai / IN
 [2010/12]
Former [2010/07]01 / Childs, Ronald F.
701 Garrett Road
QUALICUM BEACH British Columbia V9K 1L4 / CA
02 / Felipe, Carlos
574 Stonehenge Drive
ANCASTER Ontario L9K 0B2 / CA
03 / Ghosh, Raja
25 Morwick Drive
ANCASTER Ontario L9G 4Y3 / CA
04 / Mika, Alicja M.
25 Brodrick Street
HAMILTON Ontario L9S 3E3 / CA
05 / Zhou, Jinsheng
1714 Main Street West, Apt. 219
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1G8 / CA
06 / Komkova, Elena N.
1967 Main Street West, Unit 42
HAMILTON Ontario L8S 4P4 / CA
07 / Kim, Marcus
45 4497 Credit Pointe Dr., Unit 42
MISSISSAUGA Ontario L5M 3M3 / CA
08 / Dey, Tapan
1797 Main Street West, Apt. 26
HAMILTON Ontario L8S 1H6 / CA
Former [2010/02]01 / Childs, Ronald F.
701 Garrett Road
QUALICUM BEACH British Columbia V9K 1L4 / CA
02 / Felipe, Carlos
574 Stonehenge Drive
ANCASTER Ontario L9K 0B2 / CA
03 / Ghosh, Raja
25 Morwick Drive
ANCASTER Ontario L9G 4Y3 / CA
04 / Mika, Alicja M.
25 Brodrick Street
HAMILTON Ontario L9S 3E3 / CA
05 / Zhou, Jinsheng
1714 Main Street West, Apt. 219
HAMILTON Ontario L8S 1G8 / CA
06 / Komkova, Elena N.
1967 Main Street West, Unit 42
HAMILTON Ontario L8S 4P4 / CA
07 / Kim, Marcus
45 4497 Credit Pointe Dr., Unit 42
MISSISSAUGA Ontario L5M 3M3 / CA
08 / Dey, Tapan
1797 Main Street West, Apt. 26
HAMILTON Ontario L8S 1H6 / CA
Representative(s)Graf von Stosch, Andreas
Graf von Stosch
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Prinzregentenstraße 22
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/52]Graf von Stosch, Andreas
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
Former [2010/02]Rambelli, Paolo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date09172746.129.01.2004
[2010/02]
Priority number, dateUS20030447730P19.02.2003         Original published format: US 447730 P
[2010/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2143482
Date:13.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:B01D67/00, B01D69/10, B01D69/14, B01D69/12, B01D15/08, B01J20/32, B01D69/02, B01D71/40, B01J20/26, B01J20/28, B01J20/285, B01J20/286, B01J20/291, B01J39/26, B01J41/20, B01J47/00, B01J47/12, C07K1/04, C07K1/20, C07K1/22, C07K1/34
[2010/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/02]
TitleGerman:Geträgerte poröse Gele umfassende Verbundmaterialien[2010/02]
English:Composite materials comprising supported porous gels[2010/02]
French:Matériaux composites porteur de gels poreux[2010/02]
Examination procedure08.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
04.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination10.01.2020Appeal received
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04706115.5  / EP1617936
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040706115) is  06.10.2006
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.04.2015Request for further processing filed
17.04.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.05.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
03.12.2012Request for further processing filed
03.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.12.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
14.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5160627  (CUSSLER EDWARD L [US], et al) [XD] 1-2 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 17 * * column 3, line 33 - column 8, line 39; examples 1-5 *;
 [A]US5316680  (FRECHET JEAN M J [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5756717  (PALIWAL SANDEEP K [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9717129  (UNIV TOLEDO [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0054866  (FOSTER MILLER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-2 * page 11, line 26 - page 18, line 11 * * page 21, line 19 - page 24, line 7 * * page 25, line 18 - page 28, line 32; example 12 *;
 [AD]US5277915  (PROVONCHEE RICHARD B [US], et al) [AD] 1-2 * column 3, line 3 - line 26 * * column 3, line 42 - line 49 * * column 3, line 52 - column 7, line 48 *;
 [A]US3997482  (TURKOVA JAROSLAVA, et al) [A] 1-2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4108804  (SEITA TORU, et al) [A] 1-2 * the whole document *
 [A]  - VLADIMIR I LOZINSKY ET AL, "The potential of polymeric cryogels in bioseparation", BIOSEPARATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20010701), vol. 10, no. 4-5, ISSN 1573-8272, pages 163 - 188, XP019232318 [A] 1-2 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MIKA ALICJA,CHILDS RONALD, DICKSON JAME, "Chemical valves based on poly(4-vinylpyridine)-filled microporous membranes", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (19990203), vol. 153, no. 1, pages 45 - 56, XP002280492 [A] 1-2 * page 46 - page 49; tables 1,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(98)00246-4
by applicantUS4224415
 US4889632
 US4923610
 US4952349
 US5160627
 US111992
 US5593576
 US5599453
 US5672276
 US5723601
 US5906734
 US6045697
 US6086769
 US6258276
 EP0316642
 WO0012618
 WO0050160
 EP0316642
 EP0664732
 TR2611
    - LIU, H.C.; FRIED, J.R., "Breakthrough of lysozyme through an affinity membrane of cellulose-Cibaron Blue", AICHE JOURNAL, (1994), vol. 40, pages 40 - 49
    - TENNIKOV, M.B. ET AL., "Effect of porous structure of macroporous polymer supports on resolution in high-performance membrane chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1998), vol. 798, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(97)00873-X, pages 55 - 64, XP004112340

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(97)00873-X
    - SVEC, F.; JELINKOVA, M.; VOTAVOVA, E., "Reactive macroporous membranes based on glycidyl methacrylate-ethylene dimethacrylate copolymer for high-performance membrane chromatography", ANGEW. MAKROMOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 188, pages 167 - 176
    - TENNIKOVA, T.B.; BELENKII, B.G.; SVEC, F., "High-performance membrane chromatography. A novel method of protein separation", J. LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1990), vol. 13, pages 63 - 70
    - TENNIKOVA, T.B. ET AL., "High-performance membrane chromatography of proteins, a novel method of protein separation", CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1991), vol. 555, doi:doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(01)87170-3, pages 97 - 107, XP026679883

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)87170-3
    - TENNIKOVA, T.B.; SVEC, F., "High-performance membrane chromatography: highly efficient separation method for proteins in ion-exchange, hydrophobic interaction and reversed-phase modes", J. CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1993), vol. 646, pages 279 - 288
    - VIKLUND, C.; SVEC, F.; FR6CHET, J.M.J., "Fast ion-exchange HPLC of proteins using porous poly(glycidyl methacrylate-co-ethylene dimethacrylate) monoliths grafted with poly(2-acrylamido-2-methyl- I -propanesulfonic acid)", BIOTECHNOL. PROGRESS, (1997), vol. 13, pages 597 - 600
    - MIKA, A.M.; CHILDS, R.F., "Calculation of the hydrodynamic permeability of gels and gel-filled microporous membranes", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2001), vol. 40, pages 1694 - 1705
    - MIKA A. M.; CHILDS R. F., "Calculation of the hydrodynamic permeability of gels and gel-filled microporous membranes", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2001), vol. 40, pages 1694 - 1705
    - J. HAPPEL; H. BRENNER, "Low Reynolds Numbers Hydrodynamics", NOORDHOF OF INT. PUBL., (1973), page 393
    - INUKAI M. ET AL., CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (2000), vol. 48, pages 850 - 854
    - BARBUCCI R. ET AL., J BIOMATER. SCI.-POLYM. ED., (2000), vol. 11, pages 383 - 399
    - MURDAN S., J CONTROL. RELEASE, (2003), vol. 92, pages 1 - 17
    - JENSEN M. ET AL., EUR. J PHARM. SCI., (2002), vol. 15, pages 139 - 148
    - J. HAPPEL; H. BRENNER, "Low Reynolds Number Hydrodynamics", NOORDHOF INT. PUBL., (1973), page 393
    - R.GHOSH; Z.F. CUI, "Analysis of protein transport and polarization through membranes using pulsed sample injection technique", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 175, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0376-7388(00)00397-5, pages 75 - 84, XP004206086

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(00)00397-5
    - R.GHOSH, "Fractionation of biological macromolecules using carrier phase ultrafiltration", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2001), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 1 - 11
    - R. GHOSH ET AL., "Parameter scanning ultrafiltration: rapid optimisation of protein separation", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 81, pages 673 - 682
    - KAPUR ET AL., IND. ENG. CHEM. RES, (1996), vol. 35, pages 3179 - 3185