Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2181672

EP2181672 - Knee prosthesis kit with a winged metaphyseal sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.10.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.11.2011  [2011/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
[2010/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Deruntz, Stephanie M.
114 North 3rd Street, Apt B
Pierceton, IN 46562 / US
02 / Haas, Brian D.
3 Covington Drive
Englewood, CO 80110 / US
03 / Haidukewych, George J.
5855 Emerington Crescent
Orlando, FL 32819 / US
04 / Koenemann, Jeffery L.
12040 Lupine Lane
Plymouth, IN 46563 / US
05 / Vendrely, Timothy G.
3360 Eastbrook Drive
Fort Wayne, IN 46805 / US
 [2010/18]
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/18]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date09174094.426.10.2009
[2010/18]
Priority number, dateUS20080110174P31.10.2008         Original published format: US 110174 P
[2010/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2181672
Date:05.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30, A61B17/16, A61B17/17
[2010/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Knieprothesesatz mit einer Metaphysenhülse mit Flügeln[2010/18]
English:Knee prosthesis kit with a winged metaphyseal sleeve[2010/18]
French:Kit de prothèse du genou pour un manchon métaphysaire ailé[2010/18]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/44]
25.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/46]
15.06.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2010
Documents cited:Search[XDY]US4790852  (NOILES DOUGLAS G [US]) [XD] 1-9 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 22 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 4 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 4 * * figures 1-3,8,11-13 * [Y] 10-11;
 [Y]EP0980679  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL [US]) [Y] 10-11 * figures 1,4,7b *
by applicantUS2003204267
 US2006030945
 US2005107883
 US7291174
 US6171342
 US5824097
 US5782921
 US4634444
 US6264699
 US4790852
 US5733290