Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2319984

EP2319984 - Process for production of paper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kemira Oyj
Porkkalankatu 3
00180 Helsinki / FI
[2011/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Juppo, Ari
Kemira Oyj
Isolahdentie 4 as 6
65230, Vaasa / FI
02 / Stenbacka, Ulf
Kemira Oyj
Hevosenkengäntie 10
65230, Vaasa / FI
 [2014/14]
Former [2011/19]01 / Juppo, Ari
Kemira Oyj Isolahdentie 4 as 6
65230, Vaasa / FI
02 / Stenbacka, Ulf
Kemira Oyj Hevosenkengäntie 10
65230, Vaasa / FI
Representative(s)Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu
P.O. Box 16
Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A
00101 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
Antinkatu 3 C
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2011/19]Svensson, Johan Henrik
Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date09174967.104.11.2009
[2011/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2319984
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2319984
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:D21H21/10
[2011/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/19]
TitleGerman:Procédé de production de papier[2011/19]
English:Process for production of paper[2011/19]
French:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Papier[2011/19]
Examination procedure31.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/50]
19.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2014Fee for grant paid
24.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso AB OYJ
P.O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
 02  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SOLENIS LLC
500 Hercules Road
Wilmington DE 19808 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2016/43]
Former [2015/19]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso AB OYJ
P.O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Lindberg, Berndt Åke
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
650 09 Karlstad / SE
 02  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SOLENIS LLC
500 Hercules Road
Wilmington DE 19808 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/08]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stora Enso AB OYJ
P.O. Box 309
00101 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Lindberg, Berndt Åke
Stora Enso AB
Group Intellectual Property
Box 9090
650 09 Karlstad / SE
 02  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Spilgies, Jan-Hendrik, et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 30
DE-81925 München / DE
 03  30.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SOLENIS LLC
500 Hercules Road
Wilmington DE 19808 / US
Opponent's representative
Spilgies, Jan-Hendrik, et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 30
DE-81925 München / DE
06.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.03.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition09.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1265/17
09.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
08.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1265/17
09.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
30.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1265/17
07.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.11.2009
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MK02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
TR02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU04.11.2009
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
TR02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU04.11.2009
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
TR02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/22]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/36]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
LU04.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
LU04.11.2014
Former [2015/11]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/02]AT02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY02.04.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0047628  (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,10-13,16-18 * examples 1-24; claims 1,134-147 *;
 [X]WO0166600  (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1,10,16 * claims 1-124 *;
 [A]US5964983  (DINAND ELISABETH [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6103790  (CAVAILLE JEAN-YVES [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2007091942  (STFI PACKFORSK AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009123560  (STFI PACKFORSK AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006127050  (HERCULES INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4753710
 US5194120
 WO0140577
 US4483743
 US4952278
 WO2007091942
    - WAGBERG LARS ET AL., LANGMUIR 2008, (2008), vol. 24, pages 784 - 795
    - SAITO ET AL., BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2007), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 2485 - 2491
    - WAGBERG LARS ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2008), vol. 24, pages 784 - 795