Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2163154

EP2163154 - A rotary parlour for automatic milking of animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/11]A rotary parlour for automatic milking of animals and a method for attaching teat cups to milking animals on a rotary plattform
[2015/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2016
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[2015/30]
Former [2010/11]For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Eriksson, Jan
Crusebjörnsväg 23
147 63, Uttran / SE
02 / Danneker, Gert
Fromtorpsvägen 9
147 92, Grödinge / SE
 [2015/30]
Former [2010/11]01 / Eriksson, Jan
Crusebjörnsväg 23
147 63, Uttran / SE
02 / Danneker, Gert
Fromtorpsvägen 9
147 92, Grödinge / SE
Representative(s)Hällgren, Christer
DeLaval International AB
Intellectual Property Support
Legal Affairs
P.O. Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[2015/30]
Former [2010/11]Berglund, Stefan
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58
114 50 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09176218.713.03.2008
[2010/11]
Priority number, dateSE2007000073123.03.2007         Original published format: SE 0700731
[2010/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2163154
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2163154
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/12
[2010/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2010/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Karussellmelkanlage zum automatischen Melken von Tieren[2015/12]
English:A rotary parlour for automatic milking of animals[2015/12]
French:Salle de traite rotative pour la traite automatique d'animaux[2015/12]
Former [2010/11]Karussellmelkanlage zum automatischen Melken von Tieren und Verfahren zum Anbringen von Zitzenbechern zum Melken von Tieren an einer Karussellmelkanlage
Former [2010/11]A rotary parlour for automatic milking of animals and a method for attaching teat cups to milking animals on a rotary plattform
Former [2010/11]Salle de traite rotative pour la traite automatique d'animaux et procédé pour la fixation de gobelets trayeurs aux animaux à traire sur une plateforme rotative
Examination procedure09.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
02.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2015Fee for grant paid
11.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08724229.3  / EP2131649
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080724229) is  29.11.2016
Opposition(s)25.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.03.2008
AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
BG22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
TR22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB13.03.2016
IE13.03.2016
LU13.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/31]HU13.03.2008
AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
TR22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB13.03.2016
IE13.03.2016
LU13.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU13.03.2008
AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB13.03.2016
IE13.03.2016
LU13.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/40]AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
MT22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB13.03.2016
IE13.03.2016
LU13.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/10]AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB13.03.2016
IE13.03.2016
LU13.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/08]AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
GB13.03.2016
IE13.03.2016
LU13.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
IE13.03.2016
LU13.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
LU13.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
LU13.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
LU13.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SI22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/23]AT22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
RO22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
SK22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT22.07.2015
CZ22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
EE22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/21]AT22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
IT22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT22.07.2015
ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
HR22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
PL22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
IS22.11.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI22.07.2015
LT22.07.2015
LV22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
GR23.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT22.07.2015
NO22.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT22.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6050219  (VAN DER LELY CORNELIS [CH]) [X] 1-4,7,9,11-13 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,8,10;
 [XA]DE9409372U  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [X] 1 * pages 7,8; figure 2 * [A] 2-4,7,9,11-13;
 [Y]WO0167852  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [Y] 5,6,8,10 * page 10, lines 8-33; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2005120220  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 7, line 11 - page 9, line 14; figures 1,6 *;
 [A]WO0223979  (DELAVAL HOLDING AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, lines 17-22; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]EP0689762  (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [DA] 1-13 * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 22; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4339131  (JEBENS KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 55-57; figure 1 *
by applicantEP0689762