Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2325435

EP2325435 - Threaded joint sealed to [ultra high] internal and external pressures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tenaris Connections B.V.
Piet Heinkade 55
1019 GM Amsterdam / NL
[2016/31]
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
Tenaris Connections Limited
112 Bonadie Street
Kingstown / VC
Inventor(s)01 / Mazzaferro, Gaston
Dr. Simini 250 Campana
2804, BUENOS AIRES / AR
02 / Carcagno, Gabriel E.
Dr. Simini 250 Campana
2804, BUENOS AIRES / AR
03 / Ono, Tatsuo
1-10 Minamiwatarida
Kawasaki Kanagawa 210-0855 / JP
04 / Santi, Nestor J.
Dr. Simini 250 Campana
2804, BUENOS AIRES / AR
 [2012/43]
Former [2011/21]01 / Mazzaferro, Gaston
Dr. Simini 250 Campana
2804, BUENOS AIRES / AR
02 / Carcagno, Gabriel E.
Dr. Simini 250 Campana
2804, BUENOS AIRES / AR
03 / Ono, Tatsuo
1-10 Minamiwatarida
Kawasaki Kanagawa 210-0855 / JP
04 / Santi, Nestor J.
Dr. Simini 250 Campana
2804, BUENOS AIRES / AR
Representative(s)EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2011/21]Cinquantini, Bruno , et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date09176859.824.11.2009
[2011/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2325435
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2325435
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:E21B17/042, F16L15/00
[2012/06]
Former International [2011/21]E21B17/02, F16L15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/21]
TitleGerman:Verschraubung für [ultrahoch] abgedichteten internen und externen Druck[2011/21]
English:Threaded joint sealed to [ultra high] internal and external pressures[2011/21]
French:Joint fileté étanche à des pressions internes et externes [extrêmement hautes][2011/21]
Examination procedure24.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/01]
26.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2012Fee for grant paid
24.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013  26.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE
54, rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
Opponent's representative
Marsolais, Richard
Vallourec & Mannesmann Tubes Département Propriété Industrielle 27, avenue du Général Leclerc
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
 [2014/07]
Former [2013/35]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2013   
VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
54, rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
Opponent's representative
Marsolais, Richard
Vallourec & Mannesmann Tubes Département Propriété Industrielle 27, avenue du Général Leclerc
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
28.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.09.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.09.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition04.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2445/16
16.01.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2445/16
24.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.11.2009
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MK24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
SM24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
LU24.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/36]HU24.11.2009
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
SM24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
LU24.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]HU24.11.2009
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
SM24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
LU24.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/27]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
SM24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
LU24.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2014/21]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/51]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/47]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE24.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[I]US2636753  (GRIFFIN CLAUDE L) [I] 1-19 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 13; figures 1-7 *;
 [I]EP0329990  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [I] 1 * column 4, lines 22-46 * * column 8, lines 5-10; figure 1 *;
 [I]US4445265  (OLSON WALLACE F [US], et al) [I] 1 * column 5, lines 3-26 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [I]US2992021  (NAY RALPH E) [I] 1 * column 2, lines 56-62 * * column 3, lines 3-14 * * figure 1 *;
 [I]WO2004033951  (TENARIS CONNECTIONS AG [LI], et al) [I] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4703954  (ORTLOFF DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6851727
 US6905150
 US7255374
 US6921110
 US6543816
OppositionWO0235128
 US5649725
 EP1301738
 US5360239