blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2163963

EP2163963 - Information processing apparatus for installing an encrypted program in a key implemented system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.04.2013  [2013/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/11]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Makoto, Fujiwara
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / Yusuke, Nemoto
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / Junichi, Yasui
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / Takuji, Maeda
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
05 / Takayuki, Ito
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
06 / Yasushi, Yamada
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
07 / Shinji, Inoue
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2010/11]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/11]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09177740.924.07.2003
[2010/11]
Priority number, dateJP2002021509624.07.2002         Original published format: JP 2002215096
[2010/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2163963
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2163963
Date:30.06.2010
[2010/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2010
ClassificationIPC:G06F1/00, G06F9/44
[2010/11]
CPC:
G06F21/72 (EP,US); G06F21/575 (EP,US); G06F8/60 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2105 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/11]
TitleGerman:Programmentwicklungsverfahren, Unterstützungssystem zur Programmentwicklung und Programminstallationsverfahren[2010/11]
English:Information processing apparatus for installing an encrypted program in a key implemented system[2010/11]
French:Procédé de développement de programme, système de support pour le développement de programme et procédé d' installation de programme[2010/11]
Examination procedure02.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/11]
28.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/14]
13.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/14]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03016912.2  / EP1385078
EP08167396.4  / EP2028579
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030016912) is  19.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
02.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5349643  (COX JAMES O [US], et al) [X] 5-10 * abstract ** column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 26 *;
 [X]WO9815086  (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 5-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2. - page 3, line l * * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line l *;
 [I]US5999629  (HEER DANIEL NELSON [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 3 *;
 [I]EP1185022  (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0309] *
by applicantUS5349643
 WO9815086
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.